|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
23/04/1961 | Wolverhampton Works (Erecting Shop) | Erecting Shop: 1442/72, 1503, 2204, 3788, 3816, 4101/14, 4635, 4938, 5322, 5920, 6130, 6608/15, 7244/53, 7413/24/37, 7828, 9412/84/98, 9657, 9746, 82033. Works Yard: 3711/49, 4168/687, 6126, 6839, 8437, 9792, 73037, 75021, 92004. | SLS/196106 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/02/1935 | To Service | To service as Great Western Railway Number 9746 Built at Swindon Works |
||
15/06/1947 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Llantrisant (LTS) | ||
17/11/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Swansea East Dock (87D) | ||
10/03/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 9746 | ||
01/1965 | Scrapped | Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |