Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 771 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 6171 Week
» 24223 Month
» 257143 Year
» 1922519 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 9747 on 07/02/1935

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 285
To Service Mon 07/02/1935
Withdrawal Mon 14/01/1963
Service Life 27 yrs, 11 mths , 7 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 06/1963

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 07/02/1935
88A   Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 27/02/1954
88D   Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 09/10/1954
88J   Aberdare 4w/e 12/01/1963
     Withdrawn on 14/01/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 27/02/1954
ALLOC 88D Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 11/09/1954
ALLOC 88J Aberdare 4w/e 12/01/1963
WDN   4w/e 09/02/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
17/03/1963 Swindon Works (Dump) Triangle: 4612, 4915, 5027/95, 5931, 6112, 8472. Works Yard: 3769/84, 4082, 5072/78, 5659, 6011/18/25/26, 6369, 6815, 6933, 7314, 8773/76, 9725, D6352. Weigh House: 6944, 7822. 'C' Shop: W.D. 71528. Dump: 2883, 4939, 5023, 6101, 6342/48, 6422, 6962, 8770, 9652, 9727/44/47/59/75, 7334. Dismantling Shed: 5020. 'A' Shop: D35, D101, D809, D813/18, D825/29, D1001/7/11/35. D1018-27 new - in various stages of oonstruction, D3189, D3365/98, D3424, D3505/06/22/25, D4000, D6311, D7002/32/38, 3687, 3755, 3836, 4623/73/77, 5006, 5775, 6855, 6918/22/61/72, 7919/25/28, 8109, 8433/81, 9437, 9648/66/80, 15100/05. Stock Shed: D7072 New. On Running Shed: 6000. Ex Works: 3837, 6819/78, 7913, 8459, 9405. SLS/196304
24/04/1963 Derby MPD (Dump) 42636 was badly damaged when it fell into the pit at Derby on 24th April. It is now on works undergoing assessment. SLS/196304

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/02/1935 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 9747
Built at Swindon Works
   
27/02/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A)    
09/10/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Merthyr Tydfil (88D)    
12/01/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdare (88J)    
14/01/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 9747    
06/1963 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev