Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 693 Today
» 1016 Yesterday
» 1709 Week
» 19761 Month
» 252681 Year
» 1918057 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7001 on 05/02/1943
War Dept. 77001 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90102 m/e 10/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 24972
To Service Sat 05/02/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sat 12/10/1963
Service Life 20 yrs, 8 mths , 7 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 01/1964 at T W Ward (Killamarsh)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 05/02/1943
26B   Agecroft 4w/e 02/12/1950
27D   Wigan Central (L&Y) 4w/e 23/02/1957
26C   Bolton 4w/e 20/04/1957
     Withdrawn w/e 12/10/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN NA Newton Abbot m/e 31/01/1947
LOAN 87K Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) 4w/e 22/04/1950
ALLOC 27D Wigan Central (L&Y) 4w/e 23/02/1957
ALLOC 26C Bolton 4w/e 20/04/1957
WDN   w/e 12/10/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1946 Swindon Works Locos. entering works during December included the following: 100, 1943, 2132, 2792, 2809, 2825, 2837, 2840, 2844, 2851, 2891, 2912, 2955, 2980, 2989, 3016, 3026, 3040, 3804, 3829, 3838, 3865, 4025, 4038, 4059, 4080, 4704, 4950, 4955, 5001, 5023, 5039, 5060, 5063, 5079, 5083, 5085, 5349, 5374, 5376, 5380, 5926, 5956, 5961, 6009, 6029, 6333, 6354, 6929, 6933, 6935, 6956, 7320, and W.D. 77001. Works' pilots during the same period have included: 200, 207, 242, 1731, 1732, 1761, 2723, and 2773. Practically all 57XX going through the works are now receiving a top-feed boiler. Locos. noted recently so altered are: 3766, 6709, 8711, 8753, and 8780 NEA (the latter was seen at Paddington on 28/12, working empty stock!). 5083 Bath Abbey ('Castle') is an oil burner with large tender having different shape fuel tanks. New 'Counties' reported are: 1020 (SRD), 1021 (PDN), and 1022 (LA) SLS/194702
28/02/1949 Vickers Armstrong Works Class '8' W.D. 2-8-0's awaiting repair at Vickers-Armstrong's Works during February were:-Nos. 3085, 63141, 77111/52, 77218, 77378, 77401, 79219; while those ex Works during the same period were:-Nos. 70817, 77001, 77115, 77221, 77310, 78542, 79264, 90685 (ex 79224). SLS/194904
15/10/1951 Locomotives in the 9xxxx Series Renumbering Most of these engines have now received their 9xxxx numbers, the known exceptions in mid-October being Eastern Region: 90063/96, 90153, 90215/32, 90410. London Midland Region: 90102/5/9/10/13/23/35/73/83/94, 90205/71/95, 90314/26/27/43/52/66, 90413, 90576, 90621/87. North-Eastern Region: 90100, 90309, 90518, 90627/88. Scottish Region: 90293, 90616 (2-8-0), 90760/64/65/70 (2-10-0). Western Region: 90167/76/79, 90238/61/68/84, 90312/15/55/56, 90563/65/73, 90686. Possibly a few of these have been done but not recorded; information concerning such would be welcomed. SLS/195111

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/02/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7001
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24972
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77001    
02/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Agecroft (26B)    
10/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 90102    
23/02/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Wigan Central (L&Y) (27D)    
20/04/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Bolton (26C)    
12/10/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 90102    
01/1964 Scrapped Broken up by T W Ward: Killamarsh    

prev prev