Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 774 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4287 Week
» 24580 Month
» 202484 Year
» 1867860 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7002 m/e 02/1943
War Dept. 77002 m/e 01/1945
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3001 m/e 02/1947
British Railways (1st BR) 63001 w/e 17/04/1948
British Railways 90001 m/e 04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 24973
To Service During 02/1943
Withdrawal Sun 17/04/1966
Service Life 23 yrs, 2 mths , 17 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 08/1966 at Drapers (Hull)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 02/1943
53A   Hull Dairycoates 4w/e 20/01/1951
53A   Hull Dairycoates m/e 31/01/1951
38B   Annesley 4w/e 21/04/1951
40B   Immingham w/e 08/09/1951
40B   Immingham 5w/e 22/09/1951
38A   Colwick 4w/e 29/12/1951
31B   March 5w/e 24/08/1957
36A   Doncaster w/e 24/09/1960
40E   Colwick w/e 09/10/1965
36A   Doncaster w/e 13/11/1965
     Withdrawn on 17/04/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
STOCK HLS Hull Springhead on 27/03/1946
ALLOC HTN Heaton on 13/04/1947
ALLOC TWD Tweedmouth w/e 01/11/1947
ALLOC 53A Hull Dairycoates m/e 31/01/1951
ALLOC 38B Annesley w/e 21/04/1951
ALLOC 40B Immingham w/e 08/09/1951
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 29/12/1951
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 10/08/1957
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 4w/e 01/10/1960
ALLOC 40E Colwick 5w/e 09/10/1965
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 3w/e 27/11/1965
WDN   on 17/04/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1946 General The following Austerity Engines taken into N.E. Area stock on 28/12/46 and now classified O7:- Allocated: Newport: 70800/24/37/47/72, 77276/90, 77357, 77506, 78520/34/70, 78633/56/62/74/87/90, 78718, 79285. Heaton: 70815, 77146, 77298, 78577, 78646/53. Springhead: 70804, 77002, 77110, 77211/54, 77474, 78540. York: 77316, 77486, 78680/91/6/8/9, 79185, 79240/88 SLS/194704
31/05/1949 Darlington Works New Work May: Class 'A.1' Nos. 60148 an 60149. No. 60150 was ex the Paint Shop on 14/6, painted green. Locomotives awaiting Works durine May included: Nos. 812, 61069. 1407/15, 61600/61. 62709, 2726/41/56, 5109, 5675, 5784/87, 67317, 7609/19/20, 67708, 67741 (light repair), 8159, 9377, 69824/34/36, Class '8' 79184 an 90001. To scrap yard: Nos. 2377 (frames only), 3275/77, 3300/05/07/34, 65107, 5114, 5602, 65629 an 5703. Locomotives ex Works during May included: Nos. 60955, 61035. 61100 (unlined), 61199, 61224, 62397, 62745/53, 63351/95, 63440, 65040/47/89/92, 65110, 65653/55/59, 65730, 65848, 67319/31, 68061, 69106/11, Class '8' 90662/74. Nos. 60083/86 an 60127 have been noted here painted in the new blue colours with the crest on the tender. SLS/194907
10/03/1963 Doncaster Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: 60025/44/512, 61157, 63650/978, 90001/79/411/587. Works Yard: 90035/250. Stripping Shop: 61326, 90551. Scrap Yard: 42501/18/25/6/679, 63887, 64690, 90253/70, 69520/3/38/46/75/83. Paint Shop: 65567, LNER 4472, LNER 4771. Ex Works: 61087, Waiting Works: 60118, 61128/236/87/371, 63618/98/961, 42535, 69529/68, 90559/608. Pending sale: 60014. SLS/196304
11/05/1963 Worcester Works (Erecting Shop) 4628, 7010/23/31, 9724 an 4147. SLS/196304

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7002
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24973
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77002    
02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3001    
17/04/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 63001    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90001    
20/01/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A)    
31/01/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A)    
21/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Annesley (38B)    
08/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
22/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
29/12/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
24/08/1957 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
24/09/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
09/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
13/11/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
17/04/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 90001    
08/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev