Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 833 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4346 Week
» 24639 Month
» 202543 Year
» 1867919 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7003 m/e 02/1943
War Dept. 77003 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90103 m/e 03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 24974
To Service During 02/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sun 21/11/1965
Service Life 22 yrs, 9 mths , 21 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 04/1966 at Garnham, Harris and Elton (Chesterfield)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 02/1943
CLK   Colwick w/e 13/08/1949
     Withdrawn w/e 21/11/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN NWE New England on 27/02/1947
ALLOC MEX Mexborough on 23/03/1947
ALLOC NEV Neville Hill on 05/10/1947
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 13/08/1949
ALLOC 38A Colwick on 12/07/1953
WDN   w/e 21/11/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
17/08/1947 Doncaster Works On 17/8 the following withdrawn locos. (still complete) were in the Works yard: 'D3' 2127/42/47; 'D2' 2171/86/91/96; 'Cl' 2800/12; '03' 3490/92; 'J3' 4155; 'C12' 7396 and Railcars R51909/13; whilst the following: 'D3' 2123, 'D2' 2181 and 'Dl' 2203 were observed stripped. Locos. awaiting Works or scrapping were: 'Bl' 1091, 'D3' 2139, 'D2' 2170/73, 'J3' 4121 and 'J55' 8319. W.D. No. 77003 was noted in the Erecting Shop. SLS/194710
31/03/1949 Darlington Works Locomotives awaiting Works during March included: Nos. 1173, 1240, 2343, 2703, 3005/44, 3139, 3273, 5028/36, 5091, 5668, 5715, 5821, 8180, 8705, 9107, 9374/75, 9880, 61023, 61434, 61619/43, 62730/52, 63099, 63315/80, 65119, 67709/22 (both light repairs), 69807/65, Class '8' 77499, 78578/85, 79206. To scrap yard: Nos, 3332, 5649/68, 5715, 9374. Locomotives ex Works during March included: Nos. 5629/33 (both fitted small snow ploughs at Gateshead Works), 60816, 61020 (name removed), 61216, 61422, 61618, 61644 (rebuilt 2 cyls.), 61645/47/48, 62700/21/64, 63392, 63411/17/30/65, 65094, 65656, 65800/76, 67244/68, 67344, 67615, 68265, 68409/25/32, 68708/13, 69401, 69773, W.D. 90008 (light repair), 90103, 90235, 90391, 90606. No. 5626 has been sold out of service to the Bolton Colliery, it is understood. Easingwold Rly. 0-6-OT No. 2 has been broken up in the scrap yard here by a private firm. SLS/194905
18/03/1962 Gorton Works (Outside Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: E26011/34, E27005, 63689, 63720/81, 90013/101/30/3/280/300/1/2, 90447/84, 90541/611/65/730, 92014/92/102. Outside Erecting Shop: E26000/26/33/47, 64744, 63612, 63730/62, 63775, 90103. SLS/196204

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7003
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24974
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77003    
03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90103    
13/08/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
21/11/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90103    
04/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Garnham, Harris and Elton: Chesterfield    

prev prev