Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 882 Today
» 1018 Yesterday
» 1900 Week
» 2839 Month
» 206329 Year
» 1871705 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7004 m/e 02/1943
War Dept. 77004 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90104 m/e 09/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 24975
To Service During 02/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sat 12/02/1966
Service Life 23 yrs , 12 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 06/1966 at Drapers (Hull)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 02/1943
MEX   Mexborough w/e 04/09/1948
31B   March w/e 03/11/1951
36B   Mexborough 4w/e 14/02/1953
38A   Colwick 4w/e 18/02/1956
     Withdrawn w/e 12/02/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN YK York (North) on 10/03/1947
ALLOC HLS Hull Springhead on 13/04/1947
ALLOC MEX Mexborough w/e 04/09/1948
ALLOC 31B March w/e 03/11/1951
ALLOC 36B Mexborough 4w/e 21/02/1953
ALLOC 36B Mexborough on 12/07/1953
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 25/02/1956
ALLOC 16B Colwick 5w/e 08/01/1966
WDN   w/e 12/02/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
03/01/1966 Colwick MPD Consequent upon the transfer of Colwick depot to the London Midland Region on 3rd January, 1966, the following locomotives allocated to that depot have been transferred to L.M. Region Book Stock with effect from 2nd January: D2300/1/2, D3442/89/90, D3625/6/7/8, D4064/86, 61089/92/232/81/302/90, 63644/74/5/816/73, 90104/413/533/606/69/89/706. In addition, the L.M.R. locos. transferred to Colwick, on loan, have now been returned to L.M. Reg. stock, following the transfer of the depot to that Region, together with D3152/3/64/6 and D5195 which were also on loan. SLS/196603

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7004
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24975
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77004    
04/09/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
09/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90104    
03/11/1951 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
14/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (36B)    
18/02/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
12/02/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 90104    
06/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev