Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 321 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 2022 Week
» 10137 Month
» 137580 Year
» 1802956 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7007 m/e 02/1943
War Dept. 77007 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90107 m/e 06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 24978
To Service During 02/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sat 16/11/1963
Service Life 20 yrs, 9 mths , 16 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1963 at Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 02/1943
BTN   Brighton (on loan) (On loan from War Department) on 07/11/1947
RED   Redhill 7w/e 03/05/1949
HIT   Hither Green 5w/e 04/02/1950
91M   To London Midland Region m/e 30/11/1950
25D   Mirfield 4w/e 02/12/1950
27B   Aintree 4w/e 14/08/1954
     Withdrawn w/e 16/11/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN BTN Brighton on 07/11/1947
ALLOC RED Redhill 7w/e 03/05/1949
ALLOC HIT Hither Green 5w/e 04/02/1950
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 27B Aintree 4w/e 04/09/1954
WDN   w/e 16/11/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/09/1947 Brighton Works Some of the 'Pacifics' of the 'West Country' or 'Battle of Britain' Class have recently been noted outside Brighton Works with names with the Air Force motto in oval frame underneath: Nos. 21C153 Sir Keith Park; 21C165 Hurricane; 21C166 Spitfire and 21C167 Tangmere. Later the names were covered, presumably for an official ceremony similar to those mentioned in the daily Press, e.g., 21C151 Winston Churchill; 21C152 Lord Dowding; 21C164 Fighter Command etc. The Kent & East Sussex 'Terrier' No. KES3 (ex L.B. & S.C.R. No. 70 Poplar) which entered Brighton Works at the end of April came out on September 13th painted green with black border and yellow lining. The Stroudley combined sandbox and splasher is retained but the engine is otherwise externally similar to the 'AIX' but without the rear toolbox. The copper top of the chimney is painted black. 'Austerity' No. 77037 has also recently been repaired and painted unlined black. Noteworthy engines in shops on 13/9 were: Nos. 2004, 2021, 2039, 2252 , also 'Austerity' 2-8-0's Nos. 70878 (Nimes), 77007 (Hazebrouk), 77094 (Creil), 77122 (Acheres), 77150 (Dunkerque) and 77286 (Huizen), and the last three of the 'West Country' Pacifics, the current order finishing at 21C170 . No. 2235 is used to supply steam for boiler test in place of 2255 withdrawn. Boxhill left Brighton under her own steam for Horsham on 3/9 and has since been reported in London. SLS/194710
30/06/1949 Brighton Works No. 36001, the first of the 'Leader' Class (0-6-6-0T) was outside the Works for the first time, in steam, on 21/6. The top casing was grey and the underframes and casings black. It is understood that this Class and also the new 'Battle of Britain' batch (34091 upwards) will normally be finished in lined black as for mixed traffic engines. The latest 2-8-0 repaired and re-numbered is No. 90718 (ex 79281). No. 2039 Hartland Point is in the repair shop, but its fate is uncertain: it is believed that the boiler is about worn out. Other engines recently shopped are Nos. 32488 (ex S2488), 90107 (ex 77007), 90678 (ex 79210), 32083 (plain black-so far), 90226 (ex 77311), 32536. 32576. SLS/194907

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7007
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24978
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77007    
03/05/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Redhill (RED)    
06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90107    
04/02/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (HIT)    
30/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to To London Midland Region (91M)    
02/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Mirfield (25D)    
14/08/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
16/11/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 90107    
12/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire    

prev prev