Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 29 Online
» 2850 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16256 Week
» 69272 Month
» 188799 Year
» 3215652 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
7008 |
m/e |
02/1943 |
War Dept. |
77008 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
British Railways |
90108 |
m/e |
04/1949 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1943 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 7008 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24979 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 77008 |
|
|
04/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90108 |
|
|
02/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
23/06/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
22/03/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (35A) |
|
|
19/04/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
17/05/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (68A) |
|
|
14/06/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Kingmoor (68A) |
|
|
15/11/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
13/12/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
22/09/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
16/03/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
06/02/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E) |
|
|
05/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) |
|
|
01/08/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90108 |
|
|
10/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Arnott Young: Parkgate |
|
|