Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 821 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4334 Week
» 24627 Month
» 202531 Year
» 1867907 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7009 m/e 02/1943
War Dept. 77009 m/e 01/1945
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3000 m/e 03/1947
British Railways (1st BR) 63000 w/e 12/06/1948
British Railways 90000 m/e 10/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 24980
To Service During 02/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sun 06/06/1965
Service Life 22 yrs, 4 mths , 6 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1965 at Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 02/1943
34E   New England w/e 21/02/1959
36C   Frodingham w/e 29/09/1962
     Withdrawn w/e 06/06/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC ANN Annesley on 30/03/1947
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 18/10/1947
ALLOC 34E New England 4w/e 21/02/1959
ALLOC 36C Frodingham 4w/e 06/10/1962
WDN   w/e 06/06/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/02/1946 Crewe - Smoke deflectors Smoke deflectors are being fitted to all the non-streamlined Princess Coronation locos in the same way as with 6232/52. 6234/3/50 have so far been so treated. SLS/194605
30/03/1946 W.D. ENGINES IN HOLLAND The initials N.S. indicates Nederlandsche Spoorwegen, i.e. Netherlands Railways: this being not a State to concern but a limited liability company. Reference to the Netherlands State Railways is thus incorrect.
Another point is that all W.D. locos in Holland are on to loan and have not been purchased. They still have their W.D. numbers in addition to their N.S numbers.
Six more 0-6-0 saddle tanks are on loan:-N.S. 8822 to 8827, W.D. 75026/53/86, 75104/15/99.
The 2-8-0's (W.D. 77125, 77238) which were allotted N.S. 4528/9 were in an accident last August, and were sent to Malines Works in Belgium. After overhaul, they went to to Western Germany, and so never bore their N.S. numbers. Ten more W.D. 2 8 0's went to the N.S. on loan in January, 1946:-N.S. 4528 to 4537, W.D. 77009/10, 77193/4/7, 77011/38, 77188/90, 77358. Of these, 77193/4/7 came from the Dutch State Mines in Limburg. At the same time N.S. 4511 (W.D. 79196) went to the State Mines (S.M.), while N.S. 4504/9 (W.D. 78677 and 79189) left for Belgium. These three locos. are no longer on the N.S. list. W.D. 77193 was S.M. 62.
Also noted S.M. 74 (W.D. 75002).
Sixty 2-10-0's are on loan to the N.S. from January, 1946:-N.S. 5001 to 5060: W.D. 73650/61/2/4-71/3/5/6/9-81/9-93/5-9, 73700/1/4-7/9/11-3/5/7-22/7/9/32-4/6-41/4/5/7-9.
SLS/194605

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7009
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24980
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77009    
03/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3000    
12/06/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 63000    
10/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90000    
21/02/1959 Allocation Reallocated to New England (34E)    
29/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
06/06/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90000    
11/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Cox and Danks: Wadsley Bridge    

prev prev