Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 807 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2488 Week
» 22781 Month
» 200685 Year
» 1866061 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7012 m/e 03/1943
War Dept. 77012 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90110 m/e 01/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 24983
To Service During 03/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sat 07/03/1964
Service Life 21 yrs , 8 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1964 at Albert Looms (Spondon)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1943
84G   Shrewsbury 4w/e 12/08/1950
84G   Shrewsbury 4w/e 31/08/1950
26C   Bolton 4w/e 24/02/1951
26C   Bolton m/e 28/02/1951
9K   Bolton w/e 14/09/1963
9J   Agecroft w/e 19/10/1963
     Withdrawn w/e 07/03/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN OXY Oxley m/e 31/10/1946
ALLOC BAN Banbury m/e 31/07/1947
ALLOC 84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 12/08/1950
ALLOC 26C Bolton m/e 28/02/1951
ALLOC 26C Bolton 4w/e 13/08/1955
ALLOC 26B Agecroft 5w/e 03/03/1962
ALLOC 9K Bolton 5w/e 12/10/1963
ALLOC 9J Agecroft 4w/e 09/11/1963
WDN   w/e 07/03/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
15/10/1951 Locomotives in the 9xxxx Series Renumbering Most of these engines have now received their 9xxxx numbers, the known exceptions in mid-October being Eastern Region: 90063/96, 90153, 90215/32, 90410. London Midland Region: 90102/5/9/10/13/23/35/73/83/94, 90205/71/95, 90314/26/27/43/52/66, 90413, 90576, 90621/87. North-Eastern Region: 90100, 90309, 90518, 90627/88. Scottish Region: 90293, 90616 (2-8-0), 90760/64/65/70 (2-10-0). Western Region: 90167/76/79, 90238/61/68/84, 90312/15/55/56, 90563/65/73, 90686. Possibly a few of these have been done but not recorded; information concerning such would be welcomed. SLS/195111
05/03/1961 Crewe Works (Erecting Shops) Paint Shop: D90/5, 41247/50/5/7/9/64/82, 45228, 45658, 48686, 48733, L.N.W.R. 1054, and the usual preserved engines. Outside Paint Shop: D86/9/91-3, 44768, 48470. 48693, 49395, 84012. Works Sidings: 42584, 42678, 44665, 44868, 45101/90/8, 45205/64, 45391, 45500/4, 45612, 46101/64, 47271, 47672, 48101/22, 48437, 48628/57, 48734, 49149/73, 49335, 78030/4/64, 90313/43, 92009, 92159. Erecting Shops: D94/100-7, 41203/26, 42086, 42557/67, 42657/86, 44664/91, 44738/73, 44802/22/40, 44917, 45062/95, 45106/13/6/48/85, 45217/38/41/57, 45302/14/39/72/92, 45425/46, 45514, 45629/45/98, 45702/8, 46139/44, 46231, 47008, 48345, 48502, 48659, 49122, 49431, 70042, 71000, 90064, 90110, 90207/92, 90399, 90544/79/84, 92046/69. Outside Erecting Shops: 45000/15, 45533, 46421, 48895, 49328, 49448, 92135. New Erecting Shop: D96-9/108/9. Outside New Erecting Shop: D110. Scrap Road: 40001, 42397, 42438, 43194, 43333, 43562, 49243, with 45511 just cut-up. Leaving Works: 45341, 45613, 48705, 92087. Works Shunters: 12020, 44373/4, 47592, 47618, 51412/46, 52312, 52441/64. SLS/196104

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7012
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24983
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77012    
12/08/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G)    
31/08/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G)    
24/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Bolton (26C)    
28/02/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Bolton (26C)    
01/1952 Renumbered Renumbered to 90110    
14/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Bolton (9K)    
19/10/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Agecroft (9J)    
07/03/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 90110    
12/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Albert Looms: Spondon    

prev prev