Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 852 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2533 Week
» 22826 Month
» 200730 Year
» 1866106 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7013 m/e 03/1943
War Dept. 77013 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90111 m/e 05/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 24984
To Service During 03/1943
Withdrawal Mon 06/04/1964
Service Life 21 yrs, 1 mth , 9 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 07/1964 at W.E.Smiths (Ecclesfield)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1943
YK   York (North) w/e 29/05/1948
CLK   Colwick w/e 04/09/1948
31B   March w/e 08/10/1950
31B   March 4w/e 21/10/1950
36C   Frodingham 5w/e 24/03/1951
36C   Frodingham m/e 31/03/1951
     Withdrawn on 06/04/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN NEV Neville Hill on 14/10/1947
ALLOC YK York (North) w/e 29/05/1948
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 04/09/1948
ALLOC 31B March w/e 08/10/1950
ALLOC 36C Frodingham m/e 31/03/1951
ALLOC 36C Frodingham on 12/07/1953
WDN   on 06/04/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
25/03/1950 Stratford Works One of the two 0-4-0T tram engines-No. 68083- has just been through shops. The crest is on the undercarriage, below the wooden body. One of the 0-6-0T tram engines has the words 'British Railways' in the same position, and does not look as neat. Locomotives in the new shops were Nos. 61004/42/50/54/89, 61332/35. 1639. 62531, 3040. 63101, 7160, 68527, 69704, 90013, 90502. ex-W.D. 77013, 79312 and outside awaiting shopping were Nos. 61235, 61559, 8386, 8647, 9684, 90392. The three Crane locomotives are now renumbered; No. 68667 noted 3/49, No. 68668 2/50 and No. 68669 3/50 (with crest). These dates are not given in the official lists, and the actual dates will be slightly earlier. In the Paint Shop were Nos. 61540 (lined), 61554. 68088, 68225, 68651, 69641, 69728; and in the old Works Nos. 61058, 61336, 61558, 62509, 2584, 2601. 62790, 2794, 4644/83, 65462, 65545/57, 7155, 7226, 8375, 8519/61, 8772, 8874/81, 9639/69. SLS/195005
11/12/1960 Gorton MPD Ex-Works on Gorton (9G) Shed: 63617, 63744, 63805, 64354, 90111. SLS/196102
03/05/1964 Doncaster Works (Stored) Near Erecting Shop: E3101-4 bodies. Works Yard: D1562 damaged, 68925, DEP100, D5513, D5593, D5815, D5816, D6734, D6737, D6757, D8234. Inside Erecting Shop: 12103, D1695, D2212, D2216, D2572, D3631, D4061, D5052, D5526, D5575, D5582, D5601, D5688, D5693, D5814, D5820, D5831, D5838, D6720, D6744, D8211, D8239, D8400, D9015. Side of Stripping Shop: D3446. Side of Erecting Shop: 63601. Waiting Cutting Up: 90263. Stripping Shop: D1508, D3484, D5564, D5603, D9008. Outside Weigh Shop: D380 ex works, D2013 ex works, D1509, D4031, D5573, D5631. Inside Paint Shop: LNER 4771, E1217, D2563, D6898. Waiting Works: 61104, 63594, 63645, 63836, 90717. Ex Works: D5528. Stored: 61080, 90111, 90165, 90583, 92169, 92170, 92175. SLS/196406

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7013
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24984
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77013    
29/05/1948 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
04/09/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
05/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90111    
08/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
21/10/1950 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
24/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
31/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
06/04/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 90111    
07/1964 Scrapped Broken up by W.E.Smiths: Ecclesfield    

prev prev