Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 807 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2488 Week
» 22781 Month
» 200685 Year
» 1866061 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7014 on 26/03/1943
War Dept. 77014 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90112 m/e 03/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 24985
To Service Tue 26/03/1943
Withdrawal Tue 10/01/1967
Service Life 23 yrs, 9 mths , 15 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1967 at Arnott Young (Dinsdale)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 26/03/1943
26F   Lees (Oldham) w/e 30/04/1949
24C   Lostock Hall w/e 14/05/1949
24D   Lower Darwen w/e 13/10/1951
24A   Accrington 8w/e 14/06/1952
25D   Mirfield 4w/e 03/12/1955
56A   Wakefield 5w/e 14/06/1958
52G   Sunderland 4w/e 03/12/1966
     Withdrawn on 10/01/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN OXY Oxley m/e 31/05/1947
ALLOC BAN Banbury m/e 31/07/1947
LOAN 24C Lostock Hall on 13/04/1949
ALLOC 26F Lees (Oldham) w/e 30/04/1949
ALLOC 24C Lostock Hall w/e 14/05/1949
ALLOC 24D Lower Darwen w/e 13/10/1951
ALLOC 24A Accrington 4w/e 14/06/1952
ALLOC 25D Mirfield 4w/e 03/12/1955
ALLOC 56A Wakefield 4w/e 14/06/1958
ALLOC 52G Sunderland 8w/e 31/12/1966
WDN   on 10/01/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
13/08/1967 Sunderland MPD On Sunday, 13th August, the following were on Sunderland shed: 63395, 63437/58, 65789/95, 65804/11/2/55/79/80/2/92/4, 90112/35, 90321/48/78/82, 90417, 90698, D2110, D3078, D3678, D6824/8/96. SLS/196709

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
26/03/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7014
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24985
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77014    
30/04/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Lees (Oldham) (26F)    
14/05/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Lostock Hall (24C)    
03/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 90112    
13/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Lower Darwen (24D)    
14/06/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Accrington (24A)    
03/12/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Mirfield (25D)    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (56A)    
03/12/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
10/01/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 90112    
12/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Arnott Young: Dinsdale    

prev prev