Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 854 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4367 Week
» 24660 Month
» 202564 Year
» 1867940 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7015 m/e 03/1943
War Dept. 77015 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90113 m/e 02/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 24986
To Service During 03/1943
Withdrawal Sun 04/09/1966
Service Life 23 yrs, 6 mths , 7 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1966 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1943
84G   Shrewsbury 4w/e 12/08/1950
84G   Shrewsbury 4w/e 31/08/1950
6C   Birkenhead Mollington Street 4w/e 02/12/1950
26A   Newton Heath 4w/e 31/12/1950
56E   Sowerby Bridge 4w/e 14/12/1957
56A   Wakefield w/e 11/01/1964
     Withdrawn on 04/09/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN PDN Old Oak Common m/e 28/02/1947
ALLOC 84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 12/08/1950
LOAN 26A Newton Heath m/e 31/12/1950
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath 4w/e 13/08/1955
LOAN 56E Sowerby Bridge 4w/e 28/12/1957
LOAN 91E To Eastern Region 4w/e 28/12/1957
ALLOC 56E Sowerby Bridge 4w/e 25/01/1958
ALLOC 56A Wakefield 5w/e 11/01/1964
WDN   on 04/09/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
15/10/1951 Locomotives in the 9xxxx Series Renumbering Most of these engines have now received their 9xxxx numbers, the known exceptions in mid-October being Eastern Region: 90063/96, 90153, 90215/32, 90410. London Midland Region: 90102/5/9/10/13/23/35/73/83/94, 90205/71/95, 90314/26/27/43/52/66, 90413, 90576, 90621/87. North-Eastern Region: 90100, 90309, 90518, 90627/88. Scottish Region: 90293, 90616 (2-8-0), 90760/64/65/70 (2-10-0). Western Region: 90167/76/79, 90238/61/68/84, 90312/15/55/56, 90563/65/73, 90686. Possibly a few of these have been done but not recorded; information concerning such would be welcomed. SLS/195111
14/07/1962 Darlington Works (Sidings) Erecting Shop: D15, D238, D347, D2232/42, D2701, D3075, D3237, D5112, D4190-2 undercoats, D4193-5 motors fitted to body shells, 43054, 60876, 60955/7, 61018, 63343, 63409/10/26, 68037, 90322, 90622/51, 92061/2. Stripping Shop: 65786, 90008, 90132. Outside Stripping Shop: 63423, 65757. Crossing: D24, D244/6/83, D2604. Diesel Shunter Test House: D4189 painted. Sidings: 60953/62/81, 61010, 63368, 63456, 65099, 65720, 65807, 67634, 67788, 68014, 69026, 90113, 92034. Scrap Yard: 61077 being cut up, 61063, 61265/98, 61415/9/43/50/1, 65693, 65751, 67666, 67753/95 partially dismantled, 61411-3/60, 65695, 65741, 67601/23/60, 67707/47/50/75, 68052, 68707, 69017/97 intact. SLS/196209

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7015
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24986
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77015    
12/08/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G)    
31/08/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G)    
02/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C)    
31/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
02/1952 Renumbered Renumbered to 90113    
14/12/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Sowerby Bridge (56E)    
11/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (56A)    
04/09/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 90113    
11/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev