Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 809 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4322 Week
» 24615 Month
» 202519 Year
» 1867895 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7016 m/e 03/1943
War Dept. 77016 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90114 m/e 03/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 24987
To Service During 03/1943
Withdrawal Tue 07/07/1964
Service Life 21 yrs, 4 mths , 9 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1964 at Motherwell Machinery and Scrap (Wishaw)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1943
STM   St Margarets w/e 04/12/1948
66B   Motherwell 5w/e 24/03/1951
66B   Motherwell m/e 31/03/1951
65D   Dawsholm 4w/e 01/12/1951
65A   Eastfield 4w/e 19/01/1963
65F   Grangemouth 4w/e 30/11/1963
     Withdrawn on 07/07/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN HTN Heaton on 01/03/1947
ALLOC NPT Newport (Teeside) on 20/04/1947
ALLOC STM St Margarets w/e 04/12/1948
ALLOC 66B Motherwell m/e 31/03/1951
ALLOC 65D Dawsholm 4w/e 01/12/1951
ALLOC 65A Eastfield 7w/e 29/12/1962
ALLOC 65F Grangemouth 4w/e 07/12/1963
WDN   on 07/07/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1949 Cowlairs Works Locomotives entering Works during December: These included Nos. 61061, 1724, 61909/94, 62411/17/29/55, 2462/69, 62472, 2480, 62485/98, 62675, 2691, 63019/63, 3172, 64527, 4568/74/77, 4922, 5908, 8453, 8952, 68958, 9133, 69150, 9193, 69221, 9518/64, 73777, 77016, 79306, 90313. SLS/195002

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7016
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24987
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77016    
04/12/1948 Allocation Reallocated to St Margarets (STM)    
03/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90114    
24/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Motherwell (66B)    
31/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Motherwell (66B)    
01/12/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Dawsholm (65D)    
19/01/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
30/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Grangemouth (65F)    
07/07/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 90114    
10/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Motherwell Machinery and Scrap: Wishaw    

prev prev