Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 30 Today
» 892 Yesterday
» 1940 Week
» 2879 Month
» 206369 Year
» 1871745 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7017 m/e 03/1943
War Dept. 77017 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90115 m/e 06/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 24988
To Service During 03/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sun 09/05/1965
Service Life 22 yrs, 2 mths , 11 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 08/1965 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1943
STV   Staveley (G.C.) w/e 26/02/1949
38A   Colwick 5w/e 23/07/1955
36C   Frodingham w/e 22/10/1960
     Withdrawn w/e 09/05/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN NWE New England on 07/03/1947
ALLOC STV Staveley (G.C.) w/e 26/02/1949
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 13/08/1955
ALLOC 36C Frodingham 4w/e 29/10/1960
WDN   w/e 09/05/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7017
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24988
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77017    
26/02/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV)    
06/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 90115    
23/07/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
22/10/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
09/05/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90115    
08/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev