Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 295 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18098 Week
» 71114 Month
» 190641 Year
» 3217494 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
7017 |
m/e |
03/1943 |
War Dept. |
77017 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
British Railways |
90115 |
m/e |
06/1951 |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1943 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 7017 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24988 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 77017 |
|
|
26/02/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV) |
|
|
06/1951 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90115 |
|
|
23/07/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (38A) |
|
|
22/10/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) |
|
|
09/05/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90115 |
|
|
08/1965 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge |
|
|