Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 805 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4318 Week
» 24611 Month
» 202515 Year
» 1867891 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7018 m/e 03/1943
War Dept. 77018 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90116 m/e 03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 24989
To Service During 03/1943
Withdrawal Tue 27/06/1967
Service Life 24 yrs, 3 mths , 30 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1967 at Drapers (Hull)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1943
51A   Darlington 5w/e 14/06/1958
56A   Wakefield 4w/e 11/10/1958
51C   West Hartlepool 4w/e 03/12/1966
     Withdrawn on 27/06/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN HLS Hull Springhead on 10/03/1947
ALLOC 53E Goole 4w/e 17/05/1958
ALLOC 51A Darlington 4w/e 14/06/1958
ALLOC 56A Wakefield 5w/e 04/10/1958
ALLOC 51C West Hartlepool 8w/e 31/12/1966
WDN   on 27/06/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/02/1954 Darlington Works North Road Works have completed Class 2 MT 78014/5, and the diesel-electric shunters are now all in traffic, No. 13081 completing the order. Engines for works include 60806/18/37/88, 61010/37/69/84, 61124, 61273, 61418/28, 62381, 62715/20/44, 63437/50/61, 65061, 65676 (to scrap yard), 65743, 65778, 67658/90, 67715/36/9/47/59/89/91, 90089, 90116, 90270/80, 90400/1/31/9, 90554, 90600. SLS/195404
13/08/1967 West Hartlepool MPD The following were on West Hartlepool on 13th August: 43015, 62026/41/2/4, 63344/87/94/7, 63407/31/5, 90061/74/6/116/210/30/54/309/39/47/60/434/59/78/92, 90627/77/95, D2068/77/8, D2153, D2205, D3137/9, D3672, D5152/65, D6756/63/6/9. SLS/196709

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7018
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24989
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77018    
03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90116    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (51A)    
11/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (56A)    
03/12/1966 Allocation Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C)    
27/06/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 90116    
10/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev