Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 852 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4365 Week
» 24658 Month
» 202562 Year
» 1867938 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7019 m/e 03/1943
War Dept. 77019 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90117 m/e 03/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 24990
To Service During 03/1943
Withdrawal Fri 20/01/1967
Service Life 23 yrs, 10 mths , 23 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 05/1967 at J McWilliams (Shettleston)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1943
62A   Thornton Junction 8w/e 22/12/1956
     Withdrawn on 20/01/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN DFU Dunfermline Upper on 19/09/1947
ALLOC 62A Thornton Junction 4w/e 01/12/1956
WDN   on 20/01/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7019
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24990
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77019    
03/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 90117    
22/12/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A)    
20/01/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 90117    
05/1967 Scrapped Broken up by J McWilliams: Shettleston    

prev prev