Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 840 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2521 Week
» 22814 Month
» 200718 Year
» 1866094 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7020 m/e 03/1943
War Dept. 77020 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90118 m/e 09/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 24991
To Service During 03/1943
Withdrawal Mon 25/11/1963
Service Life 20 yrs, 8 mths , 28 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 02/1964 at Locomotive Works (Doncaster)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1943
MEX   Mexborough (on loan) (On loan from War Department) on 18/11/1947
IMM   Immingham m/e 30/11/1949
IMM   Immingham w/e 03/12/1949
31B   March m/e 30/06/1950
36B   Mexborough 5w/e 24/03/1951
36B   Mexborough m/e 31/03/1951
38A   Colwick 4w/e 18/02/1956
     Withdrawn on 25/11/1963

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN MEX Mexborough on 18/11/1947
ALLOC IMM Immingham w/e 03/12/1949
ALLOC 31B March m/e 30/06/1950
ALLOC 36B Mexborough m/e 31/03/1951
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 25/02/1956
WDN   on 25/11/1963

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
11/12/1960 Gorton Works (Erecting Shop) Works Sidings: 40588, 43644, 47509, 63643/69, 63813, 64440, 68079, 90238/63/90, 90619. Old Iron Foundry: 62660, Scrap Yard: 42345. Erecting Shop: E26019/38, E27003, 63613/5/71, 63789/92, 63885/90, 64918, 90118/27/31/75, 90275, 90394, 90567/98, 92157. Erecting Shop Yard: E26041, 64379, 90002/36, 90362, 92151. Works Shunter: 43261. SLS/196102

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7020
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24991
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77020    
09/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90118    
30/11/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
03/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
30/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
24/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (36B)    
31/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (36B)    
18/02/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
25/11/1963 Withdrawn Condemned as 90118    
02/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster    

prev prev