Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 803 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2484 Week
» 22777 Month
» 200681 Year
» 1866057 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7021 m/e 03/1943
War Dept. 77021 m/e 01/1945
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3002 m/e 03/1947
British Railways (1st BR) 63002 w/e 29/05/1948
British Railways 90002 m/e 06/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 24992
To Service During 03/1943
Withdrawal Sun 17/04/1966
Service Life 23 yrs, 1 mth , 20 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 08/1966 at Drapers (Hull)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1943
HSY   Hornsey w/e 04/09/1948
CLK   Colwick w/e 18/09/1948
38D   Staveley (G.C.) 4w/e 20/01/1951
38D   Staveley (G.C.) m/e 31/01/1951
38A   Colwick w/e 29/09/1951
38A   Colwick 4w/e 20/10/1951
36A   Doncaster w/e 01/01/1966
     Withdrawn on 17/04/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC ANN Annesley on 30/03/1947
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 18/10/1947
ALLOC HSY Hornsey w/e 04/09/1948
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 18/09/1948
ALLOC 38D Staveley (G.C.) m/e 31/01/1951
ALLOC 38A Colwick w/e 29/09/1951
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 3w/e 01/01/1966
WDN   on 17/04/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/11/1945 Austerities It is reported that 500 Austerity 2-8-0 locomotives are to be returned from the Continent and put into traffic on the British Railways, and it will be seen from the L.N.E.R notes, that some have arrived already. Those sent to March arrived with their packing in position and did not apear to have been in traffic overseas. It is believed that considerable dumps of these engines exist in this state and it is not impossible that the whole 500 have been surplus in this manner. We understand that the L.N.E.R. will receive 120 of them.
280 locos. of this class have been sold to the Netherlands State Railways. Belgium: Locomotives are allocated as follows: Merelbeke: 70877, 77079, 77178, 77289, 77381/8, 77292, 77468, 78528/77/84, 79222/30(Merelbeke). Ostend: 70864, 77278/8314, 78519/27/60/1/4/89(Ostend). Tournai: 77095, 77285, 77447, 79211(Tournai). Louven: 70823(Louven). Brussells (Midi): 70865(Brussels Midi). Ghent Zee-Haven: 75002/3/82, 75136(Ghent Zee-Haven). Schaerbeck: 71491, 75055(Schaerbeck). Stored at Ostend (6/45): 70865. 77021/31/7/69/82, 77117/51/4/6/75/83/9/91, 77236, 77344, 78527/64/89, 78619, 79238/46/51. The last-mentioned six are N.B. 25325/50/80 and V.F. 5181/9/94, all 1944.
SLS/194602
30/06/1950 Renumbering of locomotives 63207 advised as renumbered 3/6 was previously advised 26/3/49; it is believed that 64682 was renumbered at the same time, but not advised. 3002 was renumbered 63002 as advised 29/5/48. 63213, now advised as condemned 19/6, has not been advised as renumbered from 3213. The renumbering of the 'N.4' class was completed with No. 69240 by 10/6/50 so far as the surviving stock is concerned, though 9226/41/3/7 were withdrawn as such. SLS/195008
11/12/1960 Gorton Works (Erecting Shop Yard) Works Sidings: 40588, 43644, 47509, 63643/69, 63813, 64440, 68079, 90238/63/90, 90619. Old Iron Foundry: 62660, Scrap Yard: 42345. Erecting Shop: E26019/38, E27003, 63613/5/71, 63789/92, 63885/90, 64918, 90118/27/31/75, 90275, 90394, 90567/98, 92157. Erecting Shop Yard: E26041, 64379, 90002/36, 90362, 92151. Works Shunter: 43261. SLS/196102

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7021
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24992
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77021    
03/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3002    
29/05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 63002    
04/09/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Hornsey (HSY)    
18/09/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
06/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90002    
20/01/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D)    
31/01/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D)    
29/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
20/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
01/01/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
17/04/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 90002    
08/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev