Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 822 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 6222 Week
» 24274 Month
» 257194 Year
» 1922570 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7022 m/e 03/1943
War Dept. 77022 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90119 m/e 02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 24993
To Service During 03/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sun 17/01/1965
Service Life 21 yrs, 10 mths , 20 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 05/1965 at T W Ward (Beighton)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1943
31B   March on 18/06/1950
36B   Mexborough 5w/e 24/03/1951
36B   Mexborough m/e 31/03/1951
38A   Colwick 4w/e 18/02/1956
31B   March 5w/e 24/03/1956
36A   Doncaster 4w/e 16/03/1957
41F   Mexborough 4w/e 19/07/1958
36C   Frodingham w/e 25/08/1962
     Withdrawn w/e 17/01/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
STOCK ANN Annesley on 05/02/1947
ALLOC CLK Colwick on 12/10/1947
ALLOC MEX Mexborough w/e 25/10/1947
ALLOC 31B March on 18/06/1950
ALLOC 36B Mexborough m/e 31/03/1951
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 25/02/1956
ALLOC 31B March 5w/e 31/03/1956
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 4w/e 23/03/1957
ALLOC 36B Mexborough 4w/e 14/07/1958
ALLOC 36C Frodingham 2w/e 25/08/1962
WDN   w/e 17/01/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
07/03/1965 Doncaster MPD (Awaiting sale for scrap) Awaiting sale for scrap: 62051, 63906, 90042/119, 92192. SLS/196504
04/04/1965 Doncaster Works (Stored) Erecting shop: D1522, D1776, D2039, D2554, D2958, D3159, D3327, D3650, D3689, D4073, D5051/580/607/48, D5809/49/50/61, D6716/48; Outside: D5557/95, D5623, D6733, D8233; Stripping shop: D5588, D5632/52/4/80 also D3444, D5615, D9009 an D4066; New Erecting shop: E3111-3120, D5532, D8228, D9001; Paint shop and area: E3102/8/9/10/21/2, D3701, D5557/95, D5623/84, D6729/33, D6973/4/5, D8233; Stored: 63906, 90042/70/119/647, 92192. SLS/196505

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7022
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24993
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77022    
02/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90119    
18/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
24/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (36B)    
31/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (36B)    
18/02/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
24/03/1956 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
16/03/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
19/07/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (41F)    
25/08/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
17/01/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90119    
05/1965 Scrapped Broken up by T W Ward: Beighton    

prev prev