Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 799 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4312 Week
» 24605 Month
» 202509 Year
» 1867885 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7023 m/e 03/1943
War Dept. 77023 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90120 m/e 01/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 24994
To Service During 03/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sun 04/04/1965
Service Life 22 yrs, 1 mth , 7 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 07/1965 at Arnott Young (Dinsdale)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 03/1943
38A   Colwick 4w/e 18/02/1956
36C   Frodingham w/e 22/10/1960
     Withdrawn w/e 04/04/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN MEX Mexborough on 22/10/1947
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 25/02/1956
ALLOC 36C Frodingham 4w/e 29/10/1960
WDN   w/e 04/04/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
18/01/1964 Darlington Works (under repair) Erecting Shop: 12122, D191, D2615, D3143, D3672, D5102/9, D5370/6, and 0-4-0 Depl. Diesel No. 56, D7583-89 under construction. Steam Locos under repair: 75037, 60004, 60145, 60923/70, 73092/142/162, 75046/53, 90120/709. Stripping Shop: 47482 for general, 63451, 72002, 75006, 90209/578/728. Yard Sidings: D16, D2700, D5112, 43119, 60132, 61013, 60954, 62060/65, 63468, 65033/99, 65804, 73144, 75006/40, 90026. Diesel Test House: D22, D5104 an D5169. Scrap Yard: 43131, 42770, 61468, 65810, 67652, 68008/38/39/41/42/59/61, 68736, 69006/21 an 72001. SLS/196402
02/05/1965 Doncaster MPD (Shed stored) Shed stored: 63741, 90059/70/120/647. SLS/196506

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7023
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24994
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77023    
01/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90120    
18/02/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
22/10/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
04/04/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90120    
07/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Arnott Young: Dinsdale    

prev prev