Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 796 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2477 Week
» 22770 Month
» 200674 Year
» 1866050 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7025 m/e 04/1943
War Dept. 77025 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90122 m/e 12/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 24996
To Service During 04/1943
Withdrawal Mon 27/09/1965
Service Life 22 yrs, 5 mths , 27 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1965 at Garnham, Harris and Elton (Chesterfield)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 04/1943
24B   Rose Grove (Reinstated) (from WR stock) 3w/e 24/12/1949
38A   Colwick 4w/e 25/11/1950
38A   Colwick m/e 30/11/1950
8B   Warrington Dallam 4w/e 08/09/1951
26G   Belle Vue 4w/e 26/01/1952
26G   Belle Vue 4w/e 23/02/1952
26A   Newton Heath 4w/e 21/04/1956
56E   Sowerby Bridge 4w/e 20/10/1956
56A   Wakefield w/e 11/01/1964
     Withdrawn on 27/09/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 24B Rose Grove w/e 10/12/1949
ALLOC 38A Colwick m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 8B Warrington Dallam w/e 08/09/1951
LOAN 26G Belle Vue 4w/e 26/01/1952
ALLOC 26G Belle Vue 4w/e 23/02/1952
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath 4w/e 21/04/1956
ALLOC 25E Sowerby Bridge 4w/e 03/11/1956
ALLOC 56A Wakefield 5w/e 11/01/1964
WDN   w/e 27/09/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Sightings
Report Date Title Location Report Headcode Reference
30/11/1947 WD 2-8-0 disposals by the Ministry of Transport Harwich Docks On hand at Harwich   Statement "A" - List of austerity 2-8-0's in the UK but not yet in service

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7025
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24996
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77025    
12/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90122    
24/12/1949 Reinstated Reinstated to Rose Grove (24B)    
25/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
30/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
08/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B)    
26/01/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Belle Vue (26G)    
23/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Belle Vue (26G)    
21/04/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
20/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Sowerby Bridge (56E)    
11/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (56A)    
27/09/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90122    
11/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Garnham, Harris and Elton: Chesterfield    

prev prev