Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 841 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4354 Week
» 24647 Month
» 202551 Year
» 1867927 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7026 m/e 04/1943
War Dept. 77026 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90123 m/e 11/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 24997
To Service During 04/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sat 27/03/1965
Service Life 21 yrs, 11 mths , 24 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 07/1965 at Drapers (Hull)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 04/1943
84G   Shrewsbury 4w/e 09/09/1950
84G   Shrewsbury 4w/e 30/09/1950
26A   Newton Heath 4w/e 31/12/1950
26D   Bury 4w/e 29/12/1951
26B   Agecroft 8w/e 05/10/1957
26E   Lees (Oldham) 4w/e 28/12/1957
9D   Newton Heath w/e 18/04/1964
8L   Aintree w/e 04/07/1964
10H   Lower Darwen w/e 25/07/1964
10F   Rose Grove w/e 07/11/1964
     Withdrawn w/e 27/03/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 91W To Western Region / GWR m/e 31/03/1947
ALLOC BAN Banbury m/e 31/07/1947
LOAN LMTN Leamington m/e 31/12/1949
ALLOC 84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 09/09/1950
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath m/e 31/12/1950
ALLOC 26D Bury 4w/e 29/12/1951
ALLOC 26D Bury 4w/e 13/08/1955
ALLOC 26B Agecroft 4w/e 05/10/1957
ALLOC 26E Lees (Oldham) 4w/e 28/12/1957
ALLOC 9D Newton Heath 4w/e 02/05/1964
ALLOC 8L Aintree 5w/e 11/07/1964
ALLOC 10H Lower Darwen 4w/e 08/08/1964
ALLOC 10F Rose Grove 4w/e 07/11/1964
WDN   w/e 27/03/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/05/1947 Wolverhampton Stafford Road Works W.D. locos. which have been repaired at these Works can readily be distinguished from those which have passed through Swindon, as they are painted all black, with red buffer beams and plain lettering. The following are amongst those which have been dealt with here: Nos. 77026, 77053, 77079, 77097, 77106, 77123, 77184, 77202. 77210, 77214, 77241, 77247, 77257, 77289. 77380, 77388, 78522, 78566, 78717 and 79244. SLS/194708
31/10/1948 Swindon Works New work October: Nos. 7438 DG (4/10), 7439 LLY (12/10); 4165 TYS (7/10), 4166 (15/10), 4167 (22/10), whilst under construction were:-Nos. *4168/69, 6760-69 (6760/61 were almost complete on 27/10). These will be followed by Nos. 6991-99 and 7900 under Lot 368. *It is understood that Nos. 4170-79 will not be built at present. Locomotives entering Works October: These included Nos. 259 (condemned)-this is the last Barry Rly. Class 'B' to retain the original boiler, 783 (condemned), 1023/26, 1362, 1745 (condemned), 2166-this is the last of .the class to retain a boiler with a round-topped firebox. The boiler also carries a rather unusual type of safety valve, upon which are mounted the whistles, 2243/52, 2709 (condemned), 2804/48/65, 2928 (condemned), 2989 (condemned), 3005/13/39/46 (all condemned), 3104/87, 3335 (condemned), 3341, 3376 (condemned), 3445 (condemned), 3811/33, 4048, 4118, 4290, 4502/29/83, 4918/32/66/93/96, 5007/38/40/69/81/83/85/91, 5111, 5214/33, 5320/40 (both condemned), 5364/84, 5530/63, 5965/74/92, 6004/09/27, 6116/37/44, 6319/30/53/55/76, 6436, 6817, 6908/22/77, 7000/17, 7215/34, 7300, 9300, 9711/45. Nos. 4160-65 came out in standard G.W. green (unlined) and lettered 'British Railways'; 4166/67 black (fully lined), but not lettered; 7430-38 standard G.W. green (unlined), but not lettered, while No. 7439 came out black, being neither lined nor lettered. The following have been repainted black, fully lined, but not lettered: Nos. 4166/67, 4975, 5955, 6908/16 while Nos. 3826/61, 4128, 4280, 4532, 5183, 5207, 6393 an 7439 are also black, but are neither lined nor lettered.
Locomotives fitted with smokebox numberplates during October included:-Nos. 1991, 2144, 2838, 3826/61/64, 4088, 4128/66/67, 4280, 4532, 4639, 4975, 5015, 5183, 5207, 5375, 5951/55, 6340/71/93, 6406, 6908/16, 7439, 7730, 7818, 9730. 'Austerity' 2-8-0's Nos. 77026, 77200 an 79239 have been noted ex repair, by Armstrong Whitworth's; they were painted black and had large Gill Sans numerals. After acting as Works' pilots, Nos. 1730 an 2755 have now been finally withdrawn.
SLS/194812
15/10/1951 Locomotives in the 9xxxx Series Renumbering Most of these engines have now received their 9xxxx numbers, the known exceptions in mid-October being Eastern Region: 90063/96, 90153, 90215/32, 90410. London Midland Region: 90102/5/9/10/13/23/35/73/83/94, 90205/71/95, 90314/26/27/43/52/66, 90413, 90576, 90621/87. North-Eastern Region: 90100, 90309, 90518, 90627/88. Scottish Region: 90293, 90616 (2-8-0), 90760/64/65/70 (2-10-0). Western Region: 90167/76/79, 90238/61/68/84, 90312/15/55/56, 90563/65/73, 90686. Possibly a few of these have been done but not recorded; information concerning such would be welcomed. SLS/195111

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7026
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24997
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77026    
09/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G)    
30/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G)    
31/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
11/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 90123    
29/12/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Bury (26D)    
05/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Agecroft (26B)    
28/12/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Lees (Oldham) (26E)    
18/04/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D)    
04/07/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (8L)    
25/07/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Lower Darwen (10H)    
07/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Rose Grove (10F)    
27/03/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90123    
07/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev