Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 17 Online
» 793 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2474 Week
» 22767 Month
» 200671 Year
» 1866047 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7027 on 08/04/1943
War Dept. 77027 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90124 m/e 08/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 24998
To Service Mon 08/04/1943
Withdrawal Mon 21/06/1965
Service Life 22 yrs, 2 mths , 13 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1965 at Ellis Metals (Derwenthaugh Road, Swalwell)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 08/04/1943
STJ   Severn Tunnel Junction m/e 31/05/1948
25A   Wakefield (Reinstated) (Ex store on WR) w/e 18/06/1949
25D   Mirfield w/e 03/03/1951
25D   Mirfield 4w/e 24/03/1951
56A   Wakefield 5w/e 14/06/1958
     Withdrawn on 21/06/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN CDF Cardiff Canton m/e 31/03/1948
ALLOC STJ Severn Tunnel Junction m/e 31/05/1948
LOAN 25A Wakefield on 14/06/1949
ALLOC 25D Mirfield w/e 03/03/1951
ALLOC 56A Wakefield 4w/e 14/06/1958
WDN   on 21/06/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Sightings
Report Date Title Location Report Headcode Reference
30/11/1947 WD 2-8-0 disposals by the Ministry of Transport Unknown European port Being prepared for transit from Europe to Harwich   Statement "A" - List of austerity 2-8-0's in the UK but not yet in service
03/12/1947   Harwich Docks Arrived at Harwich from the continent after WD use.   Railway Executive Committee

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
29/02/1948 Swindon Works Locomotives entering Works during February included:- Nos. 1013-15 1943, 1995, 2903, 2933, 2945, 2955, 3004, 3816, 3863, 4020, 4043, 4079, 4098, 4904, 4939, 4944, 4956, 5018, 5035, 5053, 5062, 5090, 5324, 5337, 5381, 5927, 5953, 5982, 6015, 6020, 6025, 6366, 6866, 6934, 6956, 7002, 7212, 7214, 7300, W.D. 77027, 77184, 79279, 79301 an 79309. Further locomotives ex works with prefix W and plain tanks or tenders included Nos. 823, 1433, 1441, 2288, 2951, while No. 6000 has the prefix and 'British Railways' on the tender SLS/194804
31/12/1948 Swindon Works New Work December: Nos. 6766 NEA (8/12), 6767 (21/12), 6768 (23/12); 6993 Arthog Hall WEY (4/12), 6994 Baggrave Hall EXE (9/12), 6995 Benthall Hall TN (17/12). Nos. 6993-95 are painted black and fully lined, while Nos. 6766-68 are black and unlined. Locomotives entering Works 29/11/48 to 24/12/48: These included Nos. 62 (condemned), 71 (condemned), 301 (condemned)-re-numbered from 201, 1020/21/22/24, 1400/07/44, 2068, 2414, 2833/37/94, 3430/31 (both condemned), 3614/74/82, 3724, 3808/17/21/38/59/64, 4038/39/80/90, 4087, 4112/50, 4274, 4353 (condemned), 4506/14/63/70/87, 4700, 4920/91, 5002/34/41/45/47/70/87, 5022, 5103, 5351/59/97, 5412/22, 5522/32, 5708/12, 5913/19/56/59/95, 6010/12/23, 6100/48/54, 6323/24/39/85, 6423, 6856, 6930/39/66, 7200/20/22, 7401, 7727, 9306, 9601/06. (4150 and 5022 were the locomotives that were involved in the Lapworth accident). On 16/12 the Stock Shed contained the following:-Nos. 5, 2906, 3012/15/17/18/23/41/44, 3453, 4017, 4168/69, 4914, 5153/83. Additional locomotives painted black and fully lined include Nos. 5926 an 6947. 'Austerity' No. 77380 has been fitted with a smokebox numberplate (the first 'Austerity' to be so fitted here). 'Austerity' 2-8-0's to be fitted with standard G.W.R. fittings, which include Wakefield lubricator, G.W. type stuffing box and fountain, whistles, injectors, top feed and fire iron compartment, were ex Swindon Works as follows:-Nos. 77000 (19/5/48). 77027 (24/3/48), 77165 (13/4/48), 77291 (10/12/47), 77429 (9/6/48), 78542 (12/11/47), 79226 (6/9/48), 79278 (28/11/47). Frames are being cut for Lot 373. which, it is understood, is for some 0-6-0PT's with outside Walschaerts valve gear. SLS/194902
31/03/1948 Swindon Works Locomotives entering Works during March included: Nos. 1006/16, 1434, 1861, 2943/44, 3015, 3803/53/60, 4012/16/23/26/30/35/77/90/94, 4803, 4941/98, 5006/09/25/59/68/80/97, 5339/50/78, 5901/07/48/83, 6011/13/19/22, 6318/20/22/65, 6903/20/23/42/51, 7001, 9089 an 9302. New work: Nos. 6986-89 and 0-6-0 Diesel-electric No. 15101, the latter with cast brass number plates and 'British Railways' on the sides; also numbers in 3' letters in the centre of the buffer beams. W.D. Nos. 77060/145/280/335, 79244 (all ex repair in Belgium) and 78624 arrived in the Works on 23/3 from Marston sidings. W.D. Nos. 77027 an 77165 are ex Works with G.W. type top feed and Wakefield lubricator. Works' pilots recently have been and are Nos. 198, 250, 410, 1713 an 2781; 905 ceased to work on these duties W/E 13/3 and has gone for scrapping. No. 1358 was in the Works W/E 13/3 for scrapping, while No. 3004 was cut up in the same week. No. 6022 LA went on the test plant on 18/3 for several days and is now being prepared to go to the L.N.E.R. Engines ex Works are now emerging without the prefix W. SLS/194805
04/06/1961 Darlington Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: D272, D2243, D2700, D3456, D4071-5, D5098, D5157-61, 43085, 60816/23/57/8/97, 60900, 61028, 61206/69, 61303, 63468, 67620/91. 67733, 80100, 90124, 90465/70, 90518. Stripping Shop: 60974, 65868. 67636, 80099. Outside Stripping Shop: 43116, 61464, 63382, 63466. Works Yard: D4070, D5101, 60852/69/99, 60920/75/81, 61238, 63341/58, 63452, 65099, 65753, 65801, 67643/90, 68007/43/80, 92060, 92192. Crossing: D280, D3322, D5106/56. Scrap Yard: 61416/62, 68673 all intact. SLS/196107

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/04/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7027
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24998
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77027    
31/05/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Severn Tunnel Junction (STJ)    
18/06/1949 Reinstated Reinstated to Wakefield (25A)    
03/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Mirfield (25D)    
24/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Mirfield (25D)    
08/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 90124    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (56A)    
21/06/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90124    
10/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Ellis Metals: Derwenthaugh Road, Swalwell    

prev prev