Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 21 Today
» 892 Yesterday
» 1931 Week
» 2870 Month
» 206360 Year
» 1871736 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7028 m/e 04/1943
War Dept. 77028 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90125 on 05/10/1950 (At Cowlairs Works)

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 24999
To Service During 04/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sat 17/07/1965
Service Life 22 yrs, 3 mths , 16 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1965 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 04/1943
91W   To Western Region / GWR (on loan) on 25/03/1947
66B   Motherwell (on loan) (Temporary loan for seasonal seed potato traffic.) on 26/01/1950
91W   To Western Region / GWR (Handed over at Gloucester) on 02/09/1951
84B   Oxley 4w/e 08/09/1951
84B   Oxley 4w/e 30/09/1951
86A   Ebbw Junction (Newport) m/e 31/10/1951
86C   Cardiff Canton 4w/e 06/11/1954
8B   Warrington Dallam on 30/08/1962
27B   Aintree w/e 19/01/1963
8F   Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 13/07/1963
10D   Lostock Hall w/e 14/09/1963
16E   Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 21/12/1963
10D   Lostock Hall w/e 18/04/1964
     Withdrawn w/e 17/07/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 91W To Western Region / GWR m/e 31/03/1947
LOAN 66B Motherwell on 26/01/1950
ALLOC 84B Oxley 4w/e 08/09/1951
ALLOC 86A Ebbw Junction (Newport) m/e 31/10/1951
ALLOC 86C Cardiff Canton 4w/e 06/11/1954
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region 4w/e 08/09/1962
ALLOC 8B Warrington Dallam 5w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 27B Aintree 4w/e 02/02/1963
ALLOC 8F Springs Branch (Wigan) 4w/e 03/08/1963
ALLOC 10D Lostock Hall 5w/e 12/10/1963
ALLOC 16E Kirkby in Ashfield 5w/e 11/01/1964
ALLOC 10D Lostock Hall 4w/e 02/05/1964
WDN   w/e 17/07/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/05/1948 Swindon Works Locomotives entering Works during May included: Nos. 1903, 2031, 2808/89, 2924/36/37/54, 3827, 4021/22/32/51/80/89/91/96, 4386, 4938/40/92, 5010/21/23, 5158, 5258, 5317/36/74, 5526/48/59/65, 5914/68, 6001/11/25/29, 6369/89, 6426, 6807/71, 6900/06/27/29, 7007, 7301/15, 77028, 77429 an 78714. New work (May): Nos. 7008 OXF, 7009 LDR (the latter is fitted with smokebox number plate); D.E. 15103/04 PDN; 9667-70. No. 7010 is nearly ready (28/5) and is painted pea green, as also is No. 4089, which is undergoing a general repair. Nos. 6009/26 have been painted royal blue and lined out in grey, yellow and red. Works' pilots during the month were: Nos. 1713, 2730/49/81, 3561 and D.E. 15103/04. Locomotives condemned include: Nos. 3391, 2980 an 2988. SLS/194807
25/06/1961 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) Paint Shop: D112/3, 41326, 44682, 48549, 49395, 90537, Outside Paint Shop: D109-11, 10203, 45080, 45203, 45426, 46232, 46404, 48553, 48707, 70004. Works Sidings: 41229, 42118, 45104, 45218, 45438, 45516/29, 46155, 48287, 48648/97, 48761, 90163, 90327/81/8, 90685, 92030/77. Erecting Shop: D5016, 42136/58, 42234, 42452/78, 42589, 42651, 44658/85, 44714/28/48, 44857, 44949/87, 45021, 45107/89, 45238/47/8/9/86/96, 45367/70/94, 45410/35/45, 45588, 45641/58/61, 46102/42/7, 46243, 46441, 46502, 48154, 48264, 48375, 48446, 48724/67, 49048, 90125, 90264/66, 90338, 90408, 90528, 90646, 92074. Outside Erecting Shop: D78, D108, 42226, 44888, 44946, 45254, 45615, 46131, 46238, 46484, 92032. New Erecting Shop: D75, D114-26. Scrap Yard: 40050, 40126/55/71, 47571, 47605 all intact. SLS/196108
04/02/1962 Crewe Works (Works Sidings) Paint Shop: Closed indefinitely through 50 damage being wilfully caused to paintwork of D58 by a singularly irresponsible visitor in a party on 28/1/62. Outside Paint Shop: D62/3, 45436, 45660/99, 48555. New Erecting Shop: D4/6/7, D64, D213/7/31/4/88, D317. Erecting Shop: D50-5/65-7, D237, D8044, 42150, 42484, 42550, 42617, 44661/94, 44713, 44839, 44904, 45051/8/76/8, 45144, 45209/50, 45412, 45606/48, 45723, 46106/36/8/69, 46231/6, 46420, 48039, 48366, 48478, 48503, 49277, 70029, 78039, 90190, 90245/57/61/85, 92028/77/81/3, 92111/57. Erecting Shop Yard: 42280, 45208, 45304/5/15, 46257, 52312, 90096, 90665, 92076. Works Sidings: 41239, 42445, 44709/35/70, 44870/3/95, 45093, 45211, 45494, 45522, 45642/5/52/76, 46249/56, 46431, 47334, 47580, 47631, 48325, 48400, 48550, 48624, 48708, 78036, 90125, 92089. Scrap Road: Nil. SLS/196203

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7028
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 24999
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77028    
25/03/1947 Allocation Loaned to To Western Region / GWR (91W)    
26/01/1950 Allocation Loaned to Motherwell (66B) (Temporary loan for seasonal seed potato traffic.)    
05/10/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90125    
02/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to To Western Region / GWR (91W) (Handed over at Gloucester)    
08/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Oxley (84B)    
30/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Oxley (84B)    
31/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A)    
06/11/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C)    
30/08/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B)    
19/01/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
13/07/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
14/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Lostock Hall (10D)    
21/12/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16E)    
18/04/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Lostock Hall (10D)    
17/07/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90125    
11/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev