Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 788 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4301 Week
» 24594 Month
» 202498 Year
» 1867874 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7029 m/e 04/1943
War Dept. 77029 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90126 m/e 03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25000
To Service During 04/1943
Withdrawal Tue 03/01/1967
Service Life 23 yrs, 9 mths , 3 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 06/1967 at Cox and Danks (Wadsley Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 04/1943
38A   Colwick 4w/e 25/11/1950
38A   Colwick m/e 30/11/1950
8B   Warrington Dallam 4w/e 08/09/1951
26G   Belle Vue 4w/e 26/01/1952
26G   Belle Vue 4w/e 23/02/1952
26A   Newton Heath 4w/e 21/04/1956
56F   Low Moor 4w/e 20/10/1956
51A   Darlington 5w/e 14/06/1958
56D   Mirfield 4w/e 11/10/1958
56A   Wakefield w/e 26/11/1960
56D   Mirfield w/e 17/06/1961
56B   Ardsley w/e 07/07/1962
56A   Wakefield 4w/e 06/11/1965
     Withdrawn on 03/01/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 24B Rose Grove w/e 26/03/1949
ALLOC 38A Colwick m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 8B Warrington Dallam w/e 08/09/1951
LOAN 26G Belle Vue 4w/e 26/01/1952
ALLOC 26G Belle Vue 4w/e 23/02/1952
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath 4w/e 21/04/1956
ALLOC 25F Low Moor 4w/e 03/11/1956
ALLOC 51A Darlington 4w/e 14/06/1958
ALLOC 56D Mirfield 5w/e 04/10/1958
ALLOC 56A Wakefield 4w/e 26/11/1960
ALLOC 56D Mirfield 5w/e 08/07/1961
ALLOC 56B Ardsley 5w/e 07/07/1962
ALLOC 56A Wakefield 4w/e 06/11/1965
WDN   on 03/01/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Sightings
Report Date Title Location Report Headcode Reference
30/11/1947 WD 2-8-0 disposals by the Ministry of Transport   On G.W. waiting to pass through Swindon Shops.   Statement "A" - List of austerity 2-8-0's in the UK but not yet in service

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
09/07/1947 Brighton Works New 'West Country' Pacifics under construction were 21C164-170. This completes the order. These latter ones have a V-shaped cab-front. Locos. being repaired:-2021, 2039, 2345, 2567, 21C118, 77030, 77037, 77074, 77094, 77098, 77178, 77181, and 77444. The repair of the 'Austerity' locos. is top priority hence the recent lag in 'West Country' construction. L.B. and S.C.R. No. 82 Boxhill (ex 380.S) and 377.S are both in L.B. and S.C.R. livery. 19 'Austerity' 2-8-0's were observed stored in sidings between Dover and Folkstone (16/7). Only Nos. available were 77029, 77393, and 70825. SLS/194709
21/09/1947 Kingham Dump On 21/9 the following 'Austerity' 2-8-0's were noted: those already repaired were:-Nos. 70825(4), 70875(1), 77072(1), 77126(1), 77160(1), 77171(1*), 77179(1), 77192(2), 77212(4), 77330(2), 77348(2), 77451(1), 77466(1), 77479(4), 78602(2), 78615(4), 79190(5), 79215(3) and 79221(1). Notes: (1) Bears plate-Usines Metallurgiques du Hainant; Repaired 1947. Couillet. (Belgique); (2) Bears plate-Anglo-Franco-Belge, La Croyere, Belgium. Repaired 1947; (3) Bears plate-En Ergte, Marcinelle. Repaired 1947; (4) Bears plate-Repaired by S.A. 'Les Ateliers Metallurgigues', Usine de Tubize, 1947; (5) Bears plate-S.A. Forges Usines and Fonderies, Haine-St.-Pierre, Belgique, 1947. Locomotives Automotrices Wagons, Aciers Moules. *Bears no plate but apparently comes under (1) above. No. 78615, according to the plate it carries was built in 1944 and not 1945 as is generally supposed. Those awaiting repair were:-Nos. 70833, 70865, 77029, 77048, 77092, 77229, 77239, 77242, 77332, 77463, 77471, 78541, 78544, 78546, 78551, 78554, 78556, 78563, 78685, 79272, 79275, 79282 an 79298. SLS/194710

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7029
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25000
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77029    
03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90126    
25/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
30/11/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
08/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B)    
26/01/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Belle Vue (26G)    
23/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Belle Vue (26G)    
21/04/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
20/10/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Low Moor (56F)    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (51A)    
11/10/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Mirfield (56D)    
26/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (56A)    
17/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Mirfield (56D)    
07/07/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (56B)    
06/11/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (56A)    
03/01/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 90126    
06/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Cox and Danks: Wadsley Bridge    

prev prev