Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 6 Today
» 892 Yesterday
» 1916 Week
» 2855 Month
» 206345 Year
» 1871721 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7030 m/e 04/1943
War Dept. 77030 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90127 m/e 09/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25001
To Service During 04/1943
Withdrawal Mon 26/10/1964
Service Life 21 yrs, 6 mths , 25 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1965 at Drapers (Hull)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 04/1943
HIT   Hither Green 5w/e 04/02/1950
27B   Aintree 4w/e 16/06/1951
27B   Aintree 8w/e 27/06/1951
25A   Wakefield 4w/e 11/08/1951
27B   Aintree 8w/e 19/06/1954
25G   Farnley Junction 4w/e 21/04/1956
55D   Royston w/e 14/10/1961
     Withdrawn on 26/10/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN FEL Feltham 4w/e 26/09/1947
ALLOC HIT Hither Green 5w/e 04/02/1950
ALLOC 27B Aintree w/e 16/06/1951
ALLOC 27B Aintree 8w/e 27/06/1951
ALLOC 25A Wakefield w/e 11/08/1951
ALLOC 27B Aintree 4w/e 10/07/1954
ALLOC 55D Royston 6w/e 11/11/1961
WDN   on 26/10/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
09/07/1947 Brighton Works New 'West Country' Pacifics under construction were 21C164-170. This completes the order. These latter ones have a V-shaped cab-front. Locos. being repaired:-2021, 2039, 2345, 2567, 21C118, 77030, 77037, 77074, 77094, 77098, 77178, 77181, and 77444. The repair of the 'Austerity' locos. is top priority hence the recent lag in 'West Country' construction. L.B. and S.C.R. No. 82 Boxhill (ex 380.S) and 377.S are both in L.B. and S.C.R. livery. 19 'Austerity' 2-8-0's were observed stored in sidings between Dover and Folkstone (16/7). Only Nos. available were 77029, 77393, and 70825. SLS/194709
26/09/1947 Brighton Works The following WD 2-8-0's were release from repair at Brighton Works for service from Feltham (FEL) depot: 77030, 77074 an 77460. SLS/194711
10/06/1950 Brighton Works On the occasion of the Works visit on Saturday, 10th June, the following were noted: e20001 (new livery), 31295 (lined), 31706, 32460, 34045 Ottery St. Mary, 34074, 34082 615 Squadron (30)272, 32636 (lined, waiting boiler), 42096 (tanks being fitted), 42097 (boiler in), frames up to 42102, frames of 34110, 77108/90570 (V.F.4924/43), 77359/90207, 90702, 77030/90127, and the works shunters 377S an 2235. Diesel 15203 was still outside after repair and repaint. The transfer of the 'W.D. 8F' proceeds apace; they were most useful on the Southern Region for maintaining quick goods working between the frequent passenger services (mostly electric), as they had a good turn of speed;, and they were used on empty stock and mixed trains. SLS/195007
30/06/1950 Brighton Works New construction: 4-6-2 34110; 2-6-4T 42097-42166, the first three being in a forward stage. 42096 came out early in July and bears a Brighton date plate, 1950. In for repair: 0-6-OT 515S; 0-6-2T 32460, 32594; 4-4-2T 32083; 2-6-0 32347; 2-8-0 77030, 77108, 77359; 4-6-2 34036, 34045 Ottery St. Mary, 34038 Lynton, 34082 615 Squadron. 34036 will probably now receive its name-plates Westward Ho!: this was the engine which was fitted to burn oil on the Laidlaw-Drew method till September 1948, when it was re-converted at Eastleigh to burn coal: for some reason the plates were not then affixed. The 'D.3' 32378 compares unfavourably in appearance with others of the class, as it is painted unlined black without even the usual emblem: on the other hand 32386 is kept in good condition, and the lining and emblem make it look attractive. The class 'G.6' tank recently repaired at Brighton has not been renumbered 30272 as anticipated, but is now DS3152 with tanks lettered -Engineer's Dept.' Meldon Quarry.' There is no mention of British Railways on the tanks.
B.O.B. 34074 is now named 46 Squadron. Engines going through Brighton shops hitherto have been very thoroughly brought into line with latest ideas as to lettering, etc., but 'R.1' bogie tank 31706 has had SOUTHERN replaced by the B.R. totem, yet still retaining the green shaded numerals on the bunker. The side tanks only have been repainted.
SLS/195008
28/02/1951 Southern Region WD\'s There seem to be 32 8F/2-8-0/WD on the Southern Region: 90127 an 77150 (73C), 90164 (73B), 90213 (73C), 90194 an 90216/26/34 (73B), 90247 (75A), 90254 (73H), 90257/67 (70B), 90317/60 (75B), 90389, 78597 (73C), 90408/533/552 (73B), 77090 (73C), 90558 (73B), 90562 (70B), 77101 (73B), 90566 (73C), 90570/604 (70B), 90641 (75B), 90669/71/78/702/18 (73C). The numbers are given in order of their B.R. numbers. Of the remainder, the Scottish Region has 89, the North-Eastern 122, the L.M.R. 197 and the Eastern Region 263; though occasional transfers still take place between the Regions. The Scottish Region also has the 2-10-0 engines (series 90750-90774) except one which is allotted to the C.M.E. at Rugby. SLS/195104
11/12/1960 Gorton Works (Erecting Shop) Works Sidings: 40588, 43644, 47509, 63643/69, 63813, 64440, 68079, 90238/63/90, 90619. Old Iron Foundry: 62660, Scrap Yard: 42345. Erecting Shop: E26019/38, E27003, 63613/5/71, 63789/92, 63885/90, 64918, 90118/27/31/75, 90275, 90394, 90567/98, 92157. Erecting Shop Yard: E26041, 64379, 90002/36, 90362, 92151. Works Shunter: 43261. SLS/196102

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7030
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25001
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77030    
04/02/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (HIT)    
09/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90127    
16/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
27/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
11/08/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (25A)    
19/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
21/04/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Farnley Junction (25G)    
14/10/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Royston (55D)    
26/10/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 90127    
12/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev