Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 840 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4353 Week
» 24646 Month
» 202550 Year
» 1867926 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7031 m/e 04/1943
War Dept. 77031 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90128 m/e 06/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25002
To Service During 04/1943
Withdrawal Mon 05/11/1962
Service Life 19 yrs, 7 mths , 5 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 02/1963 at Locomotive Works (Cowlairs)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 04/1943
65A   Eastfield 4w/e 04/07/1959
65F   Grangemouth 6w/e 30/12/1961
     Withdrawn on 05/11/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN THJ Thornton Junction on 20/03/1947
ALLOC 65A Eastfield 4w/e 04/07/1959
ALLOC 65F Grangemouth 6w/e 30/12/1961
WDN   on 05/11/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/11/1945 Austerities It is reported that 500 Austerity 2-8-0 locomotives are to be returned from the Continent and put into traffic on the British Railways, and it will be seen from the L.N.E.R notes, that some have arrived already. Those sent to March arrived with their packing in position and did not apear to have been in traffic overseas. It is believed that considerable dumps of these engines exist in this state and it is not impossible that the whole 500 have been surplus in this manner. We understand that the L.N.E.R. will receive 120 of them.
280 locos. of this class have been sold to the Netherlands State Railways. Belgium: Locomotives are allocated as follows: Merelbeke: 70877, 77079, 77178, 77289, 77381/8, 77292, 77468, 78528/77/84, 79222/30(Merelbeke). Ostend: 70864, 77278/8314, 78519/27/60/1/4/89(Ostend). Tournai: 77095, 77285, 77447, 79211(Tournai). Louven: 70823(Louven). Brussells (Midi): 70865(Brussels Midi). Ghent Zee-Haven: 75002/3/82, 75136(Ghent Zee-Haven). Schaerbeck: 71491, 75055(Schaerbeck). Stored at Ostend (6/45): 70865. 77021/31/7/69/82, 77117/51/4/6/75/83/9/91, 77236, 77344, 78527/64/89, 78619, 79238/46/51. The last-mentioned six are N.B. 25325/50/80 and V.F. 5181/9/94, all 1944.
SLS/194602
21/05/1947 Balornock MPD W.D. No. 77031 was on shed on 21/5, afterwards being towed to Crewe for repair, where it was seen on 31/5. (K.M.). SLS/194708
05/06/1949 Cowlairs Works Locomotives entering Works 9/5 to 5/6: These included Nos. 60503/06, 61002, 1260/1/2, 1742/66/93, 61998, 2402/40/60, 4594, 4617/26, 4818/58, 65933, 7480/91, 67631, 8104, 9209, 69500/10, 9553, 69565, Class '8' 73799, 77031, 77431/42/76, ex L.M.S. Nos. 44994, 16156. SLS/194907

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7031
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25002
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77031    
06/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90128    
04/07/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
30/12/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Grangemouth (65F)    
05/11/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 90128    
02/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Cowlairs    

prev prev