Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 781 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2462 Week
» 22755 Month
» 200659 Year
» 1866035 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7032 m/e 04/1943
War Dept. 77032 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90129 w/e 04/11/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25003
To Service During 04/1943
Withdrawal During 06/1964
Service Life 21 yrs , 2 mths

Disposal
Scrapping During 01/1965 at T W Ward (Killamarsh)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 04/1943
CLK   Colwick w/e 04/09/1948
31B   March 4w/e 23/01/1954
30A   Stratford w/e 18/04/1959
34B   Hornsey w/e 30/04/1960
34E   New England w/e 17/06/1961
40B   Immingham w/e 29/09/1962
     Withdrawn m/e 06/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN HLD Hull Dairycoates on 05/09/1947
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 04/09/1948
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 26/12/1953
ALLOC 30A Stratford 4w/e 18/04/1959
ALLOC 34B Hornsey 4w/e 14/05/1960
ALLOC 34E New England 4w/e 08/07/1961
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 06/10/1962
WDN   on 06/07/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/12/1945 Calais MPD 77032 an 77169 were noted at Calais shed in December, painted in the Nord red-brown and lined out in scarlet. SLS/194602

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7032
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25003
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77032    
04/09/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
04/11/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90129    
23/01/1954 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
18/04/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
30/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Hornsey (34B)    
17/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to New England (34E)    
29/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
06/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 90129    
01/1965 Scrapped Broken up by T W Ward: Killamarsh    

prev prev