Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 773 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2454 Week
» 22747 Month
» 200651 Year
» 1866027 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7034 m/e 04/1943
War Dept. 77034 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90130 m/e 11/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25005
To Service During 04/1943
Withdrawal Sun 17/10/1965
Service Life 22 yrs, 6 mths , 16 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 02/1966 at Drapers (Hull)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 04/1943
36B   Mexborough w/e 10/11/1951
38A   Colwick 4w/e 18/02/1956
34E   New England w/e 07/05/1960
36E   Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) w/e 13/04/1963
40E   Colwick w/e 19/06/1965
     Withdrawn on 17/10/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN NWE New England on 06/03/1947
ALLOC 36B Mexborough w/e 10/11/1951
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 25/02/1956
ALLOC 34E New England 4w/e 14/05/1960
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 3w/e 27/04/1963
ALLOC 40E Colwick 2w/e 26/06/1965
WDN   on 17/10/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
18/03/1962 Gorton Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: E26011/34, E27005, 63689, 63720/81, 90013/101/30/3/280/300/1/2, 90447/84, 90541/611/65/730, 92014/92/102. Outside Erecting Shop: E26000/26/33/47, 64744, 63612, 63730/62, 63775, 90103. SLS/196204

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7034
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25005
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77034    
11/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90130    
10/11/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (36B)    
18/02/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
07/05/1960 Allocation Reallocated to New England (34E)    
13/04/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
19/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
17/10/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90130    
02/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev