Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 16 Today
» 892 Yesterday
» 1926 Week
» 2865 Month
» 206355 Year
» 1871731 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7035 m/e 04/1943
War Dept. 77035 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90131 m/e 02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25006
To Service During 04/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sun 21/03/1965
Service Life 21 yrs, 11 mths , 18 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 07/1965 at Drapers (Hull)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 04/1943
40B   Immingham 4w/e 24/10/1953
36E   Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) w/e 28/09/1963
     Withdrawn w/e 21/03/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN MAR March on 01/08/1947
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 6w/e 05/10/1963
WDN   w/e 21/03/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
11/12/1960 Gorton Works (Erecting Shop) Works Sidings: 40588, 43644, 47509, 63643/69, 63813, 64440, 68079, 90238/63/90, 90619. Old Iron Foundry: 62660, Scrap Yard: 42345. Erecting Shop: E26019/38, E27003, 63613/5/71, 63789/92, 63885/90, 64918, 90118/27/31/75, 90275, 90394, 90567/98, 92157. Erecting Shop Yard: E26041, 64379, 90002/36, 90362, 92151. Works Shunter: 43261. SLS/196102

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7035
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25006
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77035    
02/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90131    
24/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
28/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
21/03/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90131    
07/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev