Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 777 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4290 Week
» 24583 Month
» 202487 Year
» 1867863 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7036 m/e 04/1943
War Dept. 77036 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90132 m/e 08/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25007
To Service During 04/1943
Withdrawal w/e Mon 10/04/1967
Service Life 24 yrs , 10 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 08/1967 at Drapers (Hull)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 04/1943
51L   Thornaby 5w/e 14/06/1958
50D   Goole w/e 24/08/1963
     Withdrawn w/e 10/04/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
STOCK NPT Newport (Teeside) on 24/03/1947
ALLOC 51L Thornaby on 08/06/1958
ALLOC 50D Goole 4w/e 07/09/1963
WDN   w/e 10/04/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
14/07/1962 Darlington Works (Stripping Shop) Erecting Shop: D15, D238, D347, D2232/42, D2701, D3075, D3237, D5112, D4190-2 undercoats, D4193-5 motors fitted to body shells, 43054, 60876, 60955/7, 61018, 63343, 63409/10/26, 68037, 90322, 90622/51, 92061/2. Stripping Shop: 65786, 90008, 90132. Outside Stripping Shop: 63423, 65757. Crossing: D24, D244/6/83, D2604. Diesel Shunter Test House: D4189 painted. Sidings: 60953/62/81, 61010, 63368, 63456, 65099, 65720, 65807, 67634, 67788, 68014, 69026, 90113, 92034. Scrap Yard: 61077 being cut up, 61063, 61265/98, 61415/9/43/50/1, 65693, 65751, 67666, 67753/95 partially dismantled, 61411-3/60, 65695, 65741, 67601/23/60, 67707/47/50/75, 68052, 68707, 69017/97 intact. SLS/196209

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7036
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25007
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77036    
08/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90132    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (51L)    
24/08/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Goole (50D)    
10/04/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 90132    
08/1967 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev