Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 813 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2494 Week
» 22787 Month
» 200691 Year
» 1866067 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7037 m/e 04/1943
War Dept. 77037 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90133 m/e 05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25008
To Service During 04/1943
Withdrawal Sun 17/10/1965
Service Life 22 yrs, 6 mths , 16 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 04/1966 at Arnott Young (Dinsdale)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 04/1943
IMM   Immingham w/e 12/06/1948
36C   Frodingham w/e 26/05/1951
36C   Frodingham 5w/e 23/06/1951
     Withdrawn on 17/10/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN ANN Annesley on 17/09/1947
ALLOC CLK Colwick on 12/10/1947
ALLOC IMM Immingham w/e 12/06/1948
ALLOC 36C Frodingham w/e 26/05/1951
WDN   on 17/10/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/11/1945 Austerities It is reported that 500 Austerity 2-8-0 locomotives are to be returned from the Continent and put into traffic on the British Railways, and it will be seen from the L.N.E.R notes, that some have arrived already. Those sent to March arrived with their packing in position and did not apear to have been in traffic overseas. It is believed that considerable dumps of these engines exist in this state and it is not impossible that the whole 500 have been surplus in this manner. We understand that the L.N.E.R. will receive 120 of them.
280 locos. of this class have been sold to the Netherlands State Railways. Belgium: Locomotives are allocated as follows: Merelbeke: 70877, 77079, 77178, 77289, 77381/8, 77292, 77468, 78528/77/84, 79222/30(Merelbeke). Ostend: 70864, 77278/8314, 78519/27/60/1/4/89(Ostend). Tournai: 77095, 77285, 77447, 79211(Tournai). Louven: 70823(Louven). Brussells (Midi): 70865(Brussels Midi). Ghent Zee-Haven: 75002/3/82, 75136(Ghent Zee-Haven). Schaerbeck: 71491, 75055(Schaerbeck). Stored at Ostend (6/45): 70865. 77021/31/7/69/82, 77117/51/4/6/75/83/9/91, 77236, 77344, 78527/64/89, 78619, 79238/46/51. The last-mentioned six are N.B. 25325/50/80 and V.F. 5181/9/94, all 1944.
SLS/194602
09/07/1947 Brighton Works New 'West Country' Pacifics under construction were 21C164-170. This completes the order. These latter ones have a V-shaped cab-front. Locos. being repaired:-2021, 2039, 2345, 2567, 21C118, 77030, 77037, 77074, 77094, 77098, 77178, 77181, and 77444. The repair of the 'Austerity' locos. is top priority hence the recent lag in 'West Country' construction. L.B. and S.C.R. No. 82 Boxhill (ex 380.S) and 377.S are both in L.B. and S.C.R. livery. 19 'Austerity' 2-8-0's were observed stored in sidings between Dover and Folkstone (16/7). Only Nos. available were 77029, 77393, and 70825. SLS/194709
30/09/1947 Brighton Works Some of the 'Pacifics' of the 'West Country' or 'Battle of Britain' Class have recently been noted outside Brighton Works with names with the Air Force motto in oval frame underneath: Nos. 21C153 Sir Keith Park; 21C165 Hurricane; 21C166 Spitfire and 21C167 Tangmere. Later the names were covered, presumably for an official ceremony similar to those mentioned in the daily Press, e.g., 21C151 Winston Churchill; 21C152 Lord Dowding; 21C164 Fighter Command etc. The Kent & East Sussex 'Terrier' No. KES3 (ex L.B. & S.C.R. No. 70 Poplar) which entered Brighton Works at the end of April came out on September 13th painted green with black border and yellow lining. The Stroudley combined sandbox and splasher is retained but the engine is otherwise externally similar to the 'AIX' but without the rear toolbox. The copper top of the chimney is painted black. 'Austerity' No. 77037 has also recently been repaired and painted unlined black. Noteworthy engines in shops on 13/9 were: Nos. 2004, 2021, 2039, 2252 , also 'Austerity' 2-8-0's Nos. 70878 (Nimes), 77007 (Hazebrouk), 77094 (Creil), 77122 (Acheres), 77150 (Dunkerque) and 77286 (Huizen), and the last three of the 'West Country' Pacifics, the current order finishing at 21C170 . No. 2235 is used to supply steam for boiler test in place of 2255 withdrawn. Boxhill left Brighton under her own steam for Horsham on 3/9 and has since been reported in London. SLS/194710
30/04/1949 Darlington Works New work April: Nos. 60146 an 60147. Locomotives awaiting Works during April included: Nos. 888, 1035, 61199, 1224, 1405, 61625, 1668, 2726, 62753. 2760, 3044, 3260, 3275, 63286, 5044/68, 5109, 65633/50, 5653, 65684, 5858, 65868, 7278, 7675, 67729 (light re-pair), 67739 (damaged), 8156, 69842, Class '8' W.D. 77037, 77178 an 79206. Broken up: Nos. 63286, 3316, 65633/84.
Locomotives ex Works during April included: Nos. 60816, 61023, 61215/40/57, 61422, 61434 (rebuilt), 61648, 62700/03/64/67, 63348/80/92, 63411, 65110, 65739, 65821/44, 67722 (light repair), 68015/27, 68409/14/32, 68705, 69107, 69391, 69835/36/88, Class '8' W.D. 90382, 90449 (light repair) and 90460.
SLS/194906
18/03/1962 Gorton Works (Erecting Shop) Erecting Shop: E26011/34, E27005, 63689, 63720/81, 90013/101/30/3/280/300/1/2, 90447/84, 90541/611/65/730, 92014/92/102. Outside Erecting Shop: E26000/26/33/47, 64744, 63612, 63730/62, 63775, 90103. SLS/196204
10/03/1963 Goole MPD (Stripping Shop) Stored at Goole on 10th March-60518. SLS/196304
23/04/1963 Doncaster Works (Stripping Shop) New Erecting Shop: E3090-5 no bogies, D5583, D5819, D6744. Works, Shunters : 68928/71/6. Awaiting Works: D203, D2010, D2561, D5510/95, D5602/57, D6707, D8240. Stored in Works Yards : 15004, 60014/39/49/54/76/137/500/17/26/39, 61135, 68925, 69523, 90250/3/70. Crimpsall: 60057/117/21/34/52, 62027/50, 90572/3, Dept. 10, D2008/27, D2567, D2957, D3625/45/63, D5045/70, D5523/42/84/5/609/54, D6709/804, D8205, D8401/9, D9008/19. Stripping Shop: 90043/109/33/602, D5655, D5804. Works Yard: 61348 in steam. Weigh House: 90024/569, D5822. Paint Shop: LNER 4771, 62024, 90036, D1517, D3685, D5050/5/94, D6834/5/6, E3083. SLS/196304

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7037
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25008
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77037    
12/06/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (IMM)    
05/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90133    
26/05/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
23/06/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
17/10/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90133    
04/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Arnott Young: Dinsdale    

prev prev