Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 833 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4346 Week
» 24639 Month
» 202543 Year
» 1867919 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7039 m/e 05/1943
War Dept. 77039 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90134 m/e 10/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25010
To Service During 05/1943
Withdrawal w/e Mon 30/07/1962
Service Life 19 yrs , 3 mths

Disposal
Scrapping During 01/1963 at Locomotive Works (Cowlairs)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 05/1943
66A   Polmadie 4w/e 23/02/1952
65D   Dawsholm 4w/e 21/10/1961
65B   St Rollox (Balornock) 6w/e 30/12/1961
     Withdrawn w/e 30/07/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN DFU Dunfermline Upper on 17/09/1947
LOAN 65F   on 22/05/1949
ALLOC 66A Polmadie 4w/e 23/02/1952
ALLOC 65D Dawsholm 2w/e 21/10/1961
ALLOC 65B St Rollox (Balornock) 6w/e 30/12/1961
WDN   w/e 30/07/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
01/10/1949 Cowlairs Works Locomotives entering Works 29/8 to 1/10: These included Nos. 61002/76, 61132, 1278, 61741/55/75, 1776, 61787, 61885, 61924, 62413/34, 2458, 62459, 2472, 62481, 3148, 63194, 64588, 4598, 4710, 4852/70, 4928, 64944, 4950, 5900, 65907, 7466, 67498, 67626/59/61, 68322, 8343, 8451/70/78, 69192, 69201/22, 9224, ex L.M.S. 4786, 44793, 54654, 56038, ex W.D. 77039/63, 77313/24, 90774. The only classes noted ex Cowlairs so far with the crest are 'B.1', 'J.39', 'K.2', 'K.3' and W.D. 2-8-0 and 2-10-0. No former N.B. engines have been noted with the crest, but many are lined in the latest style. SLS/194911

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7039
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25010
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77039    
10/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90134    
23/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
21/10/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Dawsholm (65D)    
30/12/1961 Allocation Reallocated to St Rollox (Balornock) (65B)    
30/07/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 90134    
01/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Cowlairs    

prev prev