Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 93 Today
» 1162 Yesterday
» 6020 Week
» 4758 Month
» 419079 Year
» 1640644 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7040 on 09/05/1943
War Dept. 77040 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90135 m/e 06/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25011
To Service Sat 09/05/1943
Withdrawal 4w/e Sat 09/09/1967
Scrapping During 10/1967 at Hughes Bolckows (North Blyth)
Service Life 24 yrs , 4 mths
Information Received at Swindon ex Dover 13/8/1946

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) on 09/05/1943
24D Lower Darwen 4w/e 02/12/1950
25C Goole 8w/e 29/11/1952
51A Darlington 5w/e 14/06/1958
56D Mirfield w/e 07/11/1959
56A Wakefield w/e 24/12/1960
56D Mirfield w/e 17/06/1961
56B Ardsley w/e 07/03/1964
56A Wakefield 4w/e 17/07/1965
52G Sunderland 4w/e 31/12/1966
   Withdrawn 4w/e 09/09/1967

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN OXY Oxley m/e 31/10/1946
ALLOC BHD Birkenhead Mollington Street m/e 30/04/1948
LOAN 24D Lower Darwen m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 24D Lower Darwen m/e 31/12/1950
ALLOC 25C Goole 4w/e 29/11/1952
ALLOC 51A Darlington 4w/e 14/06/1958
ALLOC 56D Mirfield 4w/e 28/11/1959
ALLOC 56A Wakefield 5w/e 31/12/1960
ALLOC 56D Mirfield 5w/e 08/07/1961
ALLOC 56B Ardsley 4w/e 07/03/1964
ALLOC 56A Wakefield 4w/e 17/07/1965
ALLOC 52G Sunderland 8w/e 31/12/1966
WDN   4w/e 09/09/1967

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
15/10/1951 Locomotives in the 9xxxx Series Renumbering Most of these engines have now received their 9xxxx numbers, the known exceptions in mid-October being Eastern Region: 90063/96, 90153, 90215/32, 90410. London Midland Region: 90102/5/9/10/13/23/35/73/83/94, 90205/71/95, 90314/26/27/43/52/66, 90413, 90576, 90621/87. North-Eastern Region: 90100, 90309, 90518, 90627/88. Scottish Region: 90293, 90616 (2-8-0), 90760/64/65/70 (2-10-0). Western Region: 90167/76/79, 90238/61/68/84, 90312/15/55/56, 90563/65/73, 90686. Possibly a few of these have been done but not recorded; information concerning such would be welcomed. SLS/195111
31/03/1952 Locomotives still carrying old numbers (WD) Engines which have not yet been finally renumbered. 63062, 77040, 77184, 77388, 70808, 70839, 70876, 77288, 78521, 77099, 77102, 77476, 77481, 73788, 73794. SLS/195206
13/08/1967 Sunderland MPD On Sunday, 13th August, the following were on Sunderland shed: 63395, 63437/58, 65789/95, 65804/11/2/55/79/80/2/92/4, 90112/35, 90321/48/78/82, 90417, 90698, D2110, D3078, D3678, D6824/8/96. SLS/196709

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/05/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7040
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25011
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77040    
02/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Lower Darwen (24D)    
06/1952 Renumbered Renumbered to 90135    
29/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Goole (25C)    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Darlington (51A)    
07/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Mirfield (56D)    
24/12/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (56A)    
17/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Mirfield (56D)    
07/03/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Ardsley (56B)    
17/07/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (56A)    
31/12/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
09/09/1967 Withdrawn Condemned as 90135    

prev prev