Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 14 Online
» 773 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4286 Week
» 24579 Month
» 202483 Year
» 1867859 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7041 m/e 05/1943
War Dept. 77041 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90136 m/e 10/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25012
To Service During 05/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sun 11/04/1965
Service Life 21 yrs, 11 mths , 12 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 07/1965 at Cashmore's (Great Bridge)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 05/1943
41F   Mexborough 4w/e 19/07/1958
41D   Canklow w/e 08/12/1962
     Withdrawn w/e 11/04/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN ANN Annesley on 23/08/1947
ALLOC STV Staveley (G.C.) on 12/10/1947
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 15/11/1947
ALLOC 36B Mexborough 4w/e 14/07/1958
ALLOC 41D Canklow 2w/e 15/12/1962
WDN   w/e 11/04/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
26/04/1964 Derby Shed (On Shed) On Shed: 45334 x Wok - Cw, D1730, D1732, 12088, 12095, D3022, D4132, D5265 ex works; On Shed: D1735 undercoat, 42161, 42181, 44042, 44134, 44243, 44909, 45002, 45186, 45253, 47320, 47447, 47461, 48199, 48208, 48391, 48490, 48541, 73139, 78057, 90136, 90078, 90357, 90529, 92022, 60876, 68079. SLS/196406

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7041
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25012
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77041    
10/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90136    
19/07/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (41F)    
08/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Canklow (41D)    
11/04/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90136    
07/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Great Bridge    

prev prev