Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 829 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4342 Week
» 24635 Month
» 202539 Year
» 1867915 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7042 m/e 05/1943
War Dept. 77042 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90137 m/e 05/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25013
To Service During 05/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sat 22/12/1962
Service Life 19 yrs, 7 mths , 22 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 05/1963 at Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 05/1943
CLK   Colwick w/e 04/09/1948
WFD   Woodford Halse m/e 07/1949
WFD   Woodford Halse w/e 23/07/1949
     Withdrawn w/e 22/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
STOCK CLK Colwick on 19/02/1947
ALLOC BRN Barnsley on 27/04/1947
ALLOC NEV Neville Hill on 05/10/1947
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 04/09/1948
ALLOC WFD Woodford Halse w/e 23/07/1949
LOAN 2G Woodford Halse on 01/02/1958
ALLOC 2G Woodford Halse on 23/02/1958
WDN   w/e 22/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
08/01/1961 Crewe Works (Erecting Shop) Paint Shop: D77/8, D83/5, D3921, 42179, 45063/8, 45646/95, 48755, L.N.W.R. 1054 and the usual preserved engines. Outside Paint Shop: D74/5/9, D80/2/4, 44767, 45132, 45201, 45348, 45667, 46457, 48529, 48600, 70032, 90346. Works Sidings: 40161, 44697, 44734/82, 44867, 44936, 45336, 45428, 46235, 46430, 49158/99, 49270, 49432, 70021, 84015, 92092, 92160/7. Erecting Shop: D90-6, 42476, 42580, 44869, 45037/48, 45197, 45219/40/50/77/94, 45302/44, 45411/9, 45506/78/82, 45616/38/54/75/80, 46203/9/47/50/5, 46410/36, 48054, 48120/73, 48255, 48438, 48635/68, 48898, 49281, 70033, 90137/8/57/97, 90203/33/51, 90316, 90509, 92018/33/43, 92134/55/65. Outside Erecting Shop: 42295, 45515/60, 46103/36/7, 48508, 49034, 90297, 92048. New Erecting Shop: D76, D81/6-9, D97-102. Cutting-up Shop: Nil. SLS/196102

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7042
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25013
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77042    
04/09/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
07/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
23/07/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
05/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 90137    
22/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 90137    
05/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire    

prev prev