Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 807 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2488 Week
» 22781 Month
» 200685 Year
» 1866061 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7046 m/e 05/1943
War Dept. 77046 m/e 01/1945
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3005 m/e 02/1947
British Railways (1st BR) 63005 m/e 06/1948
British Railways 90005 m/e 04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25017
To Service During 05/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sun 25/04/1965
Service Life 21 yrs, 11 mths , 26 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 07/1965 at Drapers (Hull)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 05/1943
31B   March m/e 30/06/1950
36A   Doncaster 4w/e 24/10/1953
36B   Mexborough 4w/e 19/06/1954
38A   Colwick 4w/e 18/02/1956
36E   Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) w/e 28/09/1963
     Withdrawn w/e 25/04/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
STOCK IMM Immingham on 18/01/1947
ALLOC 31B March m/e 30/06/1950
ALLOC 36A Doncaster 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 36B Mexborough 4w/e 19/06/1954
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 25/02/1956
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) 6w/e 05/10/1963
WDN   w/e 25/04/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/01/1947 General Several 'Austerity' 2-8-0's are being repaired for service on the L.N.E.R. both at Eastleigh and Brighton, Nos. 77046/61, 77235, 77453/4, 77484 at the former and 77070, 77108, 77402/11/18, 79220, 78603, 77129, 77371/95, 77426 at the latter. 77411 has already left Brighton shops painted black, to he followed by 77070. Shed markings include La Delivrance, Le Mans, Desing Balls, Acheres, etc. Some of the tenders bear different numbers from the engines, but are renumbered to correspond with the engine number when painted. These engines are being classified '0.7' on the L.N.E.R. SLS/194702
31/03/1949 Darlington Works Locomotives awaiting Works during March included: Nos. 1173, 1240, 2343, 2703, 3005/44, 3139, 3273, 5028/36, 5091, 5668, 5715, 5821, 8180, 8705, 9107, 9374/75, 9880, 61023, 61434, 61619/43, 62730/52, 63099, 63315/80, 65119, 67709/22 (both light repairs), 69807/65, Class '8' 77499, 78578/85, 79206. To scrap yard: Nos, 3332, 5649/68, 5715, 9374. Locomotives ex Works during March included: Nos. 5629/33 (both fitted small snow ploughs at Gateshead Works), 60816, 61020 (name removed), 61216, 61422, 61618, 61644 (rebuilt 2 cyls.), 61645/47/48, 62700/21/64, 63392, 63411/17/30/65, 65094, 65656, 65800/76, 67244/68, 67344, 67615, 68265, 68409/25/32, 68708/13, 69401, 69773, W.D. 90008 (light repair), 90103, 90235, 90391, 90606. No. 5626 has been sold out of service to the Bolton Colliery, it is understood. Easingwold Rly. 0-6-OT No. 2 has been broken up in the scrap yard here by a private firm. SLS/194905
04/10/1958 Colwich MPD - stored locomotives 63729, 63839, 63614, 64976/88, 61739/52/3/4/80, 90005/25/53/288; J50s are going into store as new diesel shunters arrive (D3624/5/6/7 have arrived). SLS/195811

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7046
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25017
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77046    
02/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3005    
06/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 63005    
04/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90005    
30/06/1950 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
24/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Doncaster (36A)    
19/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (36B)    
18/02/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
28/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
25/04/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90005    
07/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev