Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 854 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 2535 Week
» 22828 Month
» 200732 Year
» 1866108 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7047 m/e 05/1943
War Dept. 77047 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90139 w/e 18/11/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25018
To Service During 05/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sun 02/05/1965
Service Life 22 yrs , 2 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 07/1965 at Drapers (Hull)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 05/1943
CLK   Colwick w/e 18/09/1948
WFD   Woodford Halse m/e 07/1949
WFD   Woodford Halse w/e 23/07/1949
CLK   Colwick w/e 28/01/1950
38D   Staveley (G.C.) w/e 10/11/1951
38A   Colwick 4w/e 29/12/1951
41F   Mexborough 4w/e 19/07/1958
41D   Canklow w/e 08/12/1962
     Withdrawn w/e 02/05/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN ANN Annesley on 20/06/1947
ALLOC WFD Woodford Halse on 12/10/1947
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 18/09/1948
ALLOC WFD Woodford Halse w/e 23/07/1949
ALLOC CLK Colwick w/e 28/01/1950
ALLOC 38D Staveley (G.C.) w/e 10/11/1951
ALLOC 38A Colwick 4w/e 29/12/1951
ALLOC 36B Mexborough 4w/e 14/07/1958
ALLOC 41D Canklow 2w/e 15/12/1962
WDN   w/e 02/05/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
05/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7047
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25018
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77047    
18/09/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
07/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
23/07/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (WFD)    
28/01/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (CLK)    
18/11/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90139    
10/11/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (38D)    
29/12/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (38A)    
19/07/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (41F)    
08/12/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Canklow (41D)    
02/05/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90139    
07/1965 Scrapped Broken up by Drapers: Hull    

prev prev