Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 856 Today
» 928 Yesterday
» 4369 Week
» 24662 Month
» 202566 Year
» 1867942 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7049 on 21/05/1943
War Dept. 77049 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90141 on 22/02/1949 (At Swindon Works)

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L943
Works Number 25020
To Service Sat 21/05/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sat 22/02/1964
Service Life 20 yrs, 9 mths , 1 dy

Disposal
Scrapping During 08/1964 at J Routledge (Bootle)

Notes
Notes Received at Swindon ex-Dover on 13th August 1946

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 21/05/1943
OXY   Oxley (on loan) (On loan from WD?) on 22/10/1946
25A   Wakefield 4w/e 02/12/1950
25A   Wakefield m/e 31/12/1950
27B   Aintree 8w/e 19/06/1954
26E   Lees (Oldham) 4w/e 28/12/1957
26F   Patricroft w/e 15/09/1962
8D   Widnes w/e 12/01/1963
27B   Aintree w/e 19/01/1963
     Withdrawn w/e 22/02/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN OXY Oxley m/e 31/10/1946
LOAN 25A Wakefield m/e 30/11/1950
ALLOC 25A Wakefield m/e 31/12/1950
ALLOC 27B Aintree 4w/e 10/07/1954
ALLOC 26E Lees (Oldham) 4w/e 28/12/1957
ALLOC 26F Patricroft 5w/e 06/10/1962
ALLOC 27B Aintree 4w/e 02/02/1963
WDN   w/e 22/02/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/01/1949 Swindon Works New Work January: Nos. 6996 Blackwell Hall (RDG (4/1)), 6997 Bryn-Ivor Hall (17/1), 6998 Burton Agnes Hall (28/1); 6769 BRY (6/1). Locomotives entering Works 30/12/48 to 28/1/49: These included Nos. p24 (Petrol), 213/46 (Both acting as Works' pilots), 1007/08/19, 1369, 1426/29, 2016 (open cab), 2235/64/94, 2445, 2807/59, 2843, 2942/79/87, 3020/44, 3631/33, 3751, 3811/57 (damaged), 3818/28/55, 4017/41/46/53/59/74/78/79/86, 4122/37, 4225/82,, 4507/10/50/94, 4601, 4801 (Ex-Carriage Stock Shed-for conversion to coal-burning), 4912/15/21/35/58, 5014/27/29/49/57/61/92/93, 5108/34, 5225, 5307/33/48/58, 5502/05/12/31/53/72, 5909/49/61/97 , 6013/23/29, 6104/38/58/66, 6304/07/32/34/59/81, 6432, 6640, 6802/03/64/65/69, 6967, 7412, 7731/62/66/86/87, 7805, 8724/26, 9604/11/53, 9732/53/69, W.D. 77049 (badly damaged), 79279, 79309. Condemned: Nos. *1538, *1713, 2717 (all to Concentration Yard), 1889/97, 2767 (open cab), 2935, 3049, 3446/48, 4320. *After acting as Works' pilot.
Further locomotives painted black and fully lined, include Nos. 4900, 5997, 6930/39, while No. 2166 came out black and unlined-with the original boiler again. No. 3020 has had a heavy repair (with a change of boiler), fitted with a smokebox numberplate, but not re-painted
SLS/194903

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
21/05/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7049
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 25020
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77049    
22/10/1946 Allocation Loaned to Oxley (OXY) (On loan from WD?)    
22/02/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90141    
02/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (25A)    
31/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Wakefield (25A)    
19/06/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
28/12/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Lees (Oldham) (26E)    
15/09/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Patricroft (26F)    
12/01/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Widnes (8D)    
19/01/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
22/02/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 90141    
08/1964 Scrapped Broken up by J Routledge: Bootle    

prev prev