Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 2967 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16373 Week
» 69389 Month
» 188916 Year
» 3215769 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
7052 |
m/e |
05/1943 |
War Dept. |
77052 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
British Railways |
90523 |
m/e |
10/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
WD/8 |
Company History |
WD |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
2289 |
Works Number |
4868 |
To Service |
During 05/1943 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sat 29/12/1962 |
Service Life |
19 yrs, 7 mths , 29 dys |
|
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
63A |
|
on |
19/01/1950 |
ALLOC |
68A |
|
w/e |
25/03/1950 |
ALLOC |
63A |
Perth South |
on |
24/04/1950 |
ALLOC |
91X |
To Scottish Region |
3w/e |
10/06/1950 |
ALLOC |
26A |
Newton Heath |
w/e |
01/09/1951 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
29/12/1962 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1943 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 7052 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 4868 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 77052 |
|
|
10/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90523 |
|
|
25/03/1950 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
24/04/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Perth South (63A) |
|
|
10/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To Scottish Region (91X) |
|
|
17/06/1950 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to To Scottish Region (91X) |
|
|
01/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
08/09/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A) |
|
|
29/12/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90523 |
|
|
10/1963 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire |
|
|