Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 1507 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14913 Week
» 67929 Month
» 187456 Year
» 3214309 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
7055 |
m/e |
05/1943 |
War Dept. |
77055 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
British Railways |
90526 |
m/e |
11/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
WD/8 |
Company History |
WD |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
2289 |
Works Number |
4871 |
To Service |
During 05/1943 |
Withdrawal |
Sat 29/12/1962 |
Service Life |
19 yrs, 7 mths , 29 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/1943 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 7055 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 4871 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 77055 |
|
|
12/02/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (HLD) |
|
|
16/04/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Neville Hill (NEV) |
|
|
13/08/1949 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (G.C.) (STV) |
|
|
11/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90526 |
|
|
16/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (35A) |
|
|
23/02/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (35A) |
|
|
19/02/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
19/03/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Plaistow (33A) |
|
|
14/05/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Plaistow (33A) |
|
|
29/12/1962 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90526 |
|
|
01/1964 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Central Wagon Co.: Wigan |
|
|