Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 193 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17996 Week
» 71012 Month
» 190539 Year
» 3217392 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
7071 |
m/e |
07/1943 |
War Dept. |
77071 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
British Railways |
90540 |
m/e |
01/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
WD/8 |
Company History |
WD |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
2290 |
Works Number |
4887 |
To Service |
During 07/1943 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sun 04/07/1965 |
Service Life |
22 yrs , 4 dys |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
07/1943 |
36C |
|
Frodingham |
5w/e |
24/03/1951 |
36C |
|
Frodingham |
m/e |
31/03/1951 |
|
|
Withdrawn |
w/e |
04/07/1965 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
LOAN |
MAR |
March |
on |
09/09/1947 |
ALLOC |
36C |
Frodingham |
m/e |
31/03/1951 |
ALLOC |
36C |
Frodingham |
on |
12/07/1953 |
WDN |
|
|
w/e |
04/07/1965 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1943 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 7071 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 4887 |
|
|
01/1945 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 77071 |
|
|
01/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90540 |
|
|
24/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) |
|
|
31/03/1951 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) |
|
|
04/07/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90540 |
|
|
04/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cox and Danks: Wadsley Bridge |
|
|