Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 455 Today
» 872 Yesterday
» 5442 Week
» 13557 Month
» 141000 Year
» 1806376 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7086 m/e 08/1943
War Dept. 77086 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90552 m/e 03/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Order Number 2290
Works Number 4902
To Service During 08/1943
Withdrawal During 04/1964
Service Life 20 yrs , 8 mths

Disposal
Scrapping During 10/1964 at Central Wagon Co. (Wigan)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1943
26A   Newton Heath w/e 18/08/1951
26A   Newton Heath 4w/e 08/09/1951
26G   Belle Vue 4w/e 23/02/1952
26A   Newton Heath 4w/e 21/04/1956
27B   Aintree w/e 22/11/1958
     Withdrawn m/e 04/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath w/e 18/08/1951
ALLOC 26G Belle Vue 4w/e 23/02/1952
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath 4w/e 21/04/1956
ALLOC 27B Aintree 4w/e 29/11/1958
WDN   w/e 02/05/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
30/11/1946 Swindon Works Locomotives entering works during October and November included 1366, 1409, 1416, 1538, 2017, 2092, 2212, 2411, 2538, 2612, 2708, 2792,2817, 2825, 2836, 2842, 2851, 2859, 2882, 2883, 2884, 2885, 2906, 2927, 2947, 2955,2980, 2987, 2889, 3016, 3026, 3363, 3421, 4038, 4042. 4046, 4052, 4059, 4903, 4934,4953, 4954, 4966, 4973, 5949, 5961, 5989, 5997, 6917, 6922, 6929, 6947, 6959, 70876, 77086, 77326, and 79309 SLS/194701
28/02/1951 Southern Region WD\'s There seem to be 32 8F/2-8-0/WD on the Southern Region: 90127 an 77150 (73C), 90164 (73B), 90213 (73C), 90194 an 90216/26/34 (73B), 90247 (75A), 90254 (73H), 90257/67 (70B), 90317/60 (75B), 90389, 78597 (73C), 90408/533/552 (73B), 77090 (73C), 90558 (73B), 90562 (70B), 77101 (73B), 90566 (73C), 90570/604 (70B), 90641 (75B), 90669/71/78/702/18 (73C). The numbers are given in order of their B.R. numbers. Of the remainder, the Scottish Region has 89, the North-Eastern 122, the L.M.R. 197 and the Eastern Region 263; though occasional transfers still take place between the Regions. The Scottish Region also has the 2-10-0 engines (series 90750-90774) except one which is allotted to the C.M.E. at Rugby. SLS/195104

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7086
Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 4902
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77086    
03/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90552    
18/08/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
08/09/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
23/02/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Belle Vue (26G)    
21/04/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
22/11/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (27B)    
04/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 90552    
10/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Central Wagon Co.: Wigan    

prev prev