Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 326 Today
» 825 Yesterday
» 2027 Week
» 10142 Month
» 137585 Year
» 1802961 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7099 m/e 09/1943
War Dept. 77099 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90563 m/e 11/1952

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Order Number 2290
Works Number 4915
To Service During 09/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sat 07/08/1965
Service Life 21 yrs, 11 mths , 7 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 01/1966 at Cashmore's (Newport)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1943
84G   Shrewsbury 4w/e 21/02/1953
84D   Leamington 4w/e 03/10/1953
84G   Shrewsbury 4w/e 24/04/1954
82B   St Philips Marsh 4w/e 06/11/1954
18B   Westhouses w/e 18/07/1959
2F   Woodford Halse w/e 05/12/1959
16D   Nottingham w/e 08/02/1964
1G   Woodford Halse w/e 18/04/1964
8L   Aintree w/e 25/04/1964
     Withdrawn w/e 07/08/1965

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN PPRD Pontypool Road m/e 31/05/1947
ALLOC 84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 21/02/1953
ALLOC 84D Leamington 4w/e 03/10/1953
ALLOC 84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 24/04/1954
ALLOC 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 06/11/1954
ALLOC 18B Westhouses on 12/07/1959
ALLOC 91M To London Midland Region m/e 31/07/1959
LOAN 2F Woodford Halse 5w/e 02/01/1960
ALLOC 2F Woodford Halse 4w/e 26/03/1960
ALLOC 16D Nottingham 5w/e 07/03/1964
ALLOC 8L Aintree 4w/e 02/05/1964
WDN   w/e 07/08/1965

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
28/02/1951 Western Region WD\'s So far as our records show, the number of 8F/2-8-0/WD working on the Western Region has been reduced to 30, as follow: 90148 (83D), 77184 (86A), 77200 (82B), 77203 (85B), 90188 (87K), 90201 (86E), 77247 (82B), 90214 (84K), 90225 (87K), 77326 (82B), 77368 (86A), 77380 (86G), 77408 (85A), 70801 (82C), 70808 (87F), 77288 (86E), 77289 (82B), 90524 (85C), 90529 (81F), 77099 (86G), 77102 (86A), 90572 (84K), 77116 (82B), 90579 (87K), 90630 (82D), 90685 (84E), 79225 (84K), 79232 (85A), 90701 (82D), 90716 (86E). SLS/195104
15/10/1951 Locomotives in the 9xxxx Series Renumbering Most of these engines have now received their 9xxxx numbers, the known exceptions in mid-October being Eastern Region: 90063/96, 90153, 90215/32, 90410. London Midland Region: 90102/5/9/10/13/23/35/73/83/94, 90205/71/95, 90314/26/27/43/52/66, 90413, 90576, 90621/87. North-Eastern Region: 90100, 90309, 90518, 90627/88. Scottish Region: 90293, 90616 (2-8-0), 90760/64/65/70 (2-10-0). Western Region: 90167/76/79, 90238/61/68/84, 90312/15/55/56, 90563/65/73, 90686. Possibly a few of these have been done but not recorded; information concerning such would be welcomed. SLS/195111
31/03/1952 Locomotives still carrying old numbers (WD) Engines which have not yet been finally renumbered. 63062, 77040, 77184, 77388, 70808, 70839, 70876, 77288, 78521, 77099, 77102, 77476, 77481, 73788, 73794. SLS/195206
26/03/1966 Awaiting Disposal (Shrewsbury) Shrewsbury: 7801/2/12/9/20/1/2/7/8, 41209, 42174, 42777, 46508, 48716, 73000/25/34/50/67/70, 75028/38, 80048/78/101/36, 84000/4, 90222/563/641; Stafford: 42958/64/82, 46527, 47480/666/777, 48112 (mainly labelled to Cashmore's, Great Bridge). SLS/196605

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7099
Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 4915
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77099    
11/1952 Renumbered Renumbered to 90563    
21/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G)    
03/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Leamington (84D)    
24/04/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G)    
06/11/1954 Allocation Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)    
18/07/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Westhouses (18B)    
05/12/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (2F)    
08/02/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Nottingham (16D)    
18/04/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (1G)    
25/04/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Aintree (8L)    
07/08/1965 Withdrawn Condemned as 90563    
01/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev