Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 42 Today
» 818 Yesterday
» 860 Week
» 17811 Month
» 170764 Year
» 1836140 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7100 m/e 09/1943
War Dept. 77100 m/e 01/1945
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3104 m/e 03/1947
British Railways (1st BR) 63104 w/e 03/07/1948
British Railways 90425 m/e 11/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Order Number 2290
Works Number 4916
To Service During 09/1943
Withdrawal Sat 29/12/1962
Service Life 19 yrs, 3 mths , 28 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1963 at Central Wagon Co. (Wigan)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 09/1943
36C   Frodingham 5w/e 24/03/1951
36C   Frodingham m/e 31/03/1951
     Withdrawn on 29/12/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
STOCK HTN Heaton on 23/10/1946
ALLOC MAR March on 27/11/1946
ALLOC 36C Frodingham m/e 31/03/1951
WDN   on 29/12/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7100
Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 4916
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77100    
03/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3104    
03/07/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 63104    
11/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90425    
24/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
31/03/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
29/12/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 90425    
12/1963 Scrapped Broken up by Central Wagon Co.: Wigan    

prev prev