28/02/1946 |
W.D. Locomotives |
The following have been noted at Folkestone recently: 77070/81, 77122/9, 77222, 77402/11/26/84, 77508, 78588. As they carried allocations painted on the cab sides, they have presumably been in traffic on the continent. |
SLS/194605 |
28/02/1946 |
Locomotives Miscellany |
More W.D. 2-8-0's appear to be allocated to B.A.; many of these engines were lately standing about in the Dover areas. 'Schools' 907 'Dulwich,' 917 'Ardingly,' 934 'St. Lawrence' are light green. 'Demob.' specials are still running frequently from Folkestone, etc., to Guildford via Tonbridge and Redhill, worked to the latter by locos, carrying Dover spare duty Nos, 462-3, but actually the engines are often B.A. or AFD. 4-4-0's. They return light from Redhill it not otherwise required. |
SLS/194605 |
28/02/1946 |
W.D. Locomotives |
The following have been noted at Folkestone recently: 77070/81, 77122/9, 77222, 77402/11/26/84, 77508, 78588. As they carried allocations painted on the cab sides, they have presumably been in traffic on the continent. |
SLS/194605 |
12/08/1947 |
Brighton Works |
On 12/8 New 'West Country' 21C166 was outside Brighton Works in works grey, but with the customary green tender. WD 77460 was outside the works freshly repaired and repainted, and 77122 was in Brighton Upper Goods awaiting works. |
SLS/194709 |
30/09/1947 |
Brighton Works |
Some of the 'Pacifics' of the 'West Country' or 'Battle of Britain' Class have recently been noted outside Brighton Works with names with the Air Force motto in oval frame underneath: Nos. 21C153 Sir Keith Park; 21C165 Hurricane; 21C166 Spitfire and 21C167 Tangmere. Later the names were covered, presumably for an official ceremony similar to those mentioned in the daily Press, e.g., 21C151 Winston Churchill; 21C152 Lord Dowding; 21C164 Fighter Command etc. The Kent & East Sussex 'Terrier' No. KES3 (ex L.B. & S.C.R. No. 70 Poplar) which entered Brighton Works at the end of April came out on September 13th painted green with black border and yellow lining. The Stroudley combined sandbox and splasher is retained but the engine is otherwise externally similar to the 'AIX' but without the rear toolbox. The copper top of the chimney is painted black. 'Austerity' No. 77037 has also recently been repaired and painted unlined black. Noteworthy engines in shops on 13/9 were: Nos. 2004, 2021, 2039, 2252 , also 'Austerity' 2-8-0's Nos. 70878 (Nimes), 77007 (Hazebrouk), 77094 (Creil), 77122 (Acheres), 77150 (Dunkerque) and 77286 (Huizen), and the last three of the 'West Country' Pacifics, the current order finishing at 21C170 . No. 2235 is used to supply steam for boiler test in place of 2255 withdrawn. Boxhill left Brighton under her own steam for Horsham on 3/9 and has since been reported in London. |
SLS/194710 |
30/11/1947 |
Brighton Works |
: No. 21C156 Croydon and 'Austerity' 77122 have just been through shops; the former has the new pattern cab and longer deflector plates. Engines in shops in mid-November were 21C126 (new deflectors and old cab-off 21C156), 21C170 Manston fully painted), 680S, 1414, 1826/80, 2022, 2039 Hartland Point, 2083/9, 2153, 2339/66, 2436/43/55/62/89/90, 2523/46/75. For the first time for many months the shops are without an 'Austerity' and old Brighton types preponderate. It is interesting to point out that the name Croydon was borne by Rennie's 0-4-2 of 1838 (London and Croydon Ry. No. 2), but apart from this engine-which became S.E.R. No. 2 as from 31/1/1846-three engines of this name have been seen on Brighton metals as follows: Craven's 2-2-2 No. 128 which was commenced by Dodds & Son of Rotherham in 1866 and finished off at Brighton Works in June, 1871, and named Croydon by Mr. Stroudley: scrapped in 1888. Stroudley's 0-4-2 No. 181, built at Brighton (estd. Works No. 463), completed early in 1890 by R. J. Billinton, and scrapped in 1929. Bulleid's 'West Country' Class No. 21C156, completed in February, 1947, and modified in November to the 'Battle of Britain' Class (estd. Works No. 1004). |
SLS/194712 |
08/07/1962 |
York South MPD |
Stored in the old south shed are 60887/95/939/82 all ex works, 61039, 61240 and 90467/571/8/663, also four BRCW d.m.us. damaged in a collision in March, viz. uE50543/76/9201/22, all noted 8th July. |
SLS/196208 |
18/01/1964 |
Darlington Works (Stripping Shop) |
Erecting Shop: 12122, D191, D2615, D3143, D3672, D5102/9, D5370/6, and 0-4-0 Depl. Diesel No. 56, D7583-89 under construction. Steam Locos under repair: 75037, 60004, 60145, 60923/70, 73092/142/162, 75046/53, 90120/709. Stripping Shop: 47482 for general, 63451, 72002, 75006, 90209/578/728. Yard Sidings: D16, D2700, D5112, 43119, 60132, 61013, 60954, 62060/65, 63468, 65033/99, 65804, 73144, 75006/40, 90026. Diesel Test House: D22, D5104 an D5169. Scrap Yard: 43131, 42770, 61468, 65810, 67652, 68008/38/39/41/42/59/61, 68736, 69006/21 an 72001. |
SLS/196402 |