Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 28 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4655 Week
» 6393 Month
» 133836 Year
» 1799212 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7142 m/e 11/1943
War Dept. 77142 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90589 m/e 02/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Order Number 2291
Works Number 4958
To Service During 11/1943
Withdrawal w/e Sat 25/04/1964
Service Life 20 yrs, 5 mths , 25 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 06/1964 at Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 11/1943
84G   Shrewsbury 4w/e 09/09/1950
84G   Shrewsbury 4w/e 30/09/1950
26A   Newton Heath 4w/e 31/12/1950
26B   Agecroft 8w/e 05/10/1957
26E   Lees (Oldham) 4w/e 28/12/1957
26A   Newton Heath 4w/e 14/06/1958
26F   Patricroft w/e 14/04/1962
26A   Newton Heath w/e 05/01/1963
2F   Woodford Halse w/e 19/01/1963
16E   Kirkby in Ashfield w/e 15/02/1964
1G   Woodford Halse w/e 18/04/1964
     Withdrawn w/e 25/04/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN 91W To Western Region / GWR m/e 31/03/1947
LOAN SDN Swindon m/e 31/01/1950
ALLOC 84G Shrewsbury 4w/e 09/09/1950
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath m/e 31/12/1950
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath 4w/e 13/08/1955
ALLOC 26B Agecroft 4w/e 05/10/1957
ALLOC 26E Lees (Oldham) 4w/e 28/12/1957
ALLOC 26F Patricroft 5w/e 05/05/1962
ALLOC 26A Newton Heath w/e 05/01/1963
ALLOC 2F Woodford Halse 4w/e 02/02/1963
TOSTORE   w/e 14/08/1963
ALLOC 16E Kirkby in Ashfield 5w/e 07/03/1964
WDN   w/e 25/04/1964
ALLOC 1G Woodford Halse 4w/e 02/05/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
11/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7142
Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 4958
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77142    
02/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90589    
09/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G)    
30/09/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G)    
31/12/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
05/10/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Agecroft (26B)    
28/12/1957 Allocation Reallocated to Lees (Oldham) (26E)    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
14/04/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Patricroft (26F)    
05/01/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (26A)    
19/01/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (2F)    
15/02/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Kirkby in Ashfield (16E)    
18/04/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Woodford Halse (1G)    
25/04/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 90589    
06/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire    

prev prev