Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 814 Today
» 1226 Yesterday
» 6214 Week
» 24266 Month
» 257186 Year
» 1922562 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 7149 m/e 12/1943
War Dept. 77149 m/e 01/1945
British Railways 90594 m/e 04/1951

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Order Number 2291
Works Number 4965
To Service During 12/1943
Withdrawal Sun 16/09/1962
Service Life 18 yrs, 9 mths , 17 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 11/1962 at Locomotive Works (Gorton)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 12/1943
MEX   Mexborough w/e 04/09/1948
40B   Immingham 4w/e 29/12/1951
40E   Langwith Junction 4w/e 20/08/1955
40E   Colwick w/e 07/05/1960
     Withdrawn on 16/09/1962

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN YK York (North) on 12/03/1947
ALLOC HLS Hull Springhead on 13/04/1947
ALLOC MEX Mexborough w/e 04/09/1948
ALLOC 40B Immingham 4w/e 29/12/1951
ALLOC 40E Langwith Junction 4w/e 13/08/1955
ALLOC 40E Colwick 4w/e 14/05/1960
WDN   on 16/09/1962

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
12/1943 To Service To service as WD Number 7149
Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 4965
   
01/1945 Renumbered Renumbered to 77149    
04/09/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Mexborough (MEX)    
04/1951 Renumbered Renumbered to 90594    
29/12/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
20/08/1955 Allocation Reallocated to Langwith Junction (40E)    
07/05/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
16/09/1962 Withdrawn Condemned as 90594    
11/1962 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Gorton    

prev prev